EP2232343 - A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A COMMON OUTPUT FROM AT LEAST TWO WIND TURBINES, A CENTRAL WIND TURBINE CONTROL SYSTEM, A WIND PARK AND A CLUSTER OF WIND PARKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.10.2020 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2020 | Revocation of patent | published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | [2017/41] |
Former [2015/23] | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 42 8200 Aarhus N / DK | ||
Former [2011/50] | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/S Hedeager 44 8200 Aarhus N / DK | ||
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states Vestas Wind Systems A/s Alsvej 21 8940 Randers SV / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KJÆR, Philip Richard Jacobsen Carne P.P. Ørums Gade 36, 1.tv DK-8000 Århus C / DK | 02 /
GARCIA, Jorge Martinez C/ Cardenal Cisneros 53, casa 23 41930 Bormujos Sevilla / ES | [2017/41] |
Former [2010/39] | 01 /
KJÆR, Philip Richard Jacobsen Carne P.P. Ørums Gade 36, 1.tv DK-8000 Århus C / DK | ||
02 /
GARCIA, Jorge Martinez Kantorvænget 5, lejl, 17 8240 Risskov / DK | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/41] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2012/33] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Rued Langgaards Vej 8 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | ||
Former [2010/39] | Jeppesen, Jens, et al Patentgruppen A/S Arosgaarden Aaboulevarden 31 8000 Aarhus C / DK | Application number, filing date | 08865302.7 | 22.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008DK00448 | Priority number, date | DK20070001871 | 20.12.2007 Original published format: DK 200701871 | US20070015451 | 20.12.2007 Original published format: US 15451 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009080036 | Date: | 02.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2232343 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2232343 | Date: | 11.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/02, F03D7/04, G05B13/02 | [2017/26] | CPC: |
G05B13/021 (EP,US);
F03D7/0284 (EP,US);
F03D7/048 (EP,US);
F05B2270/20 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/39] | G05B13/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/41] |
Former [2010/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER GEMEINSAMEN AUSGABE VON MINDESTENS ZWEI WINDTURBINEN, ZENTRALES WINDTURBINENSTEUERSYSTEM, WINDPARK UND CLUSTER VON WINDPARKS | [2010/39] | English: | A METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A COMMON OUTPUT FROM AT LEAST TWO WIND TURBINES, A CENTRAL WIND TURBINE CONTROL SYSTEM, A WIND PARK AND A CLUSTER OF WIND PARKS | [2010/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UNE SORTIE COMMUNE D'AU MOINS DEUX ÉOLIENNES, SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE CENTRALE D'ÉOLIENNES, PARC ÉOLIEN ET GROUPE DE PARCS ÉOLIENS | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 11.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.07.2018
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co. KG Beim Strohhause 17-31 20097 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Aspacher, Karl-Georg Siemens Gamesa Renewable Energy GmbH & Co. KG Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 81739 München / DE | [2018/33] | 25.07.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.12.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 05.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings | 05.12.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/48] | 07.07.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 07.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2008 | AT | 11.10.2017 | CY | 11.10.2017 | CZ | 11.10.2017 | DK | 11.10.2017 | EE | 11.10.2017 | FI | 11.10.2017 | HR | 11.10.2017 | IT | 11.10.2017 | LT | 11.10.2017 | LV | 11.10.2017 | MC | 11.10.2017 | NL | 11.10.2017 | PL | 11.10.2017 | PT | 11.10.2017 | RO | 11.10.2017 | SE | 11.10.2017 | SI | 11.10.2017 | SK | 11.10.2017 | TR | 11.10.2017 | IE | 22.12.2017 | LU | 22.12.2017 | MT | 22.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | BG | 11.01.2018 | NO | 11.01.2018 | GR | 12.01.2018 | IS | 11.02.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 22.12.2008 | |
AT | 11.10.2017 | ||
CY | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
TR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 22.12.2008 | |
AT | 11.10.2017 | ||
CY | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.12.2008 | |
AT | 11.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
MC | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SI | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
MT | 22.12.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
RO | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
IT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
PL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
CZ | 11.10.2017 | ||
DK | 11.10.2017 | ||
EE | 11.10.2017 | ||
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
SK | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 11.10.2017 | |
FI | 11.10.2017 | ||
HR | 11.10.2017 | ||
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
LV | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
SE | 11.10.2017 | ||
BG | 11.01.2018 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
GR | 12.01.2018 | ||
IS | 11.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 11.10.2017 | |
LT | 11.10.2017 | ||
NL | 11.10.2017 | ||
NO | 11.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 11.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP1790851 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) | [A] - NAYEEM RAHMAT ULLAH ET AL, "Reactive Power Ancillary Service from Wind Farms", ELECTRICAL POWER CONFERENCE, 2007. EPC 2007. IEEE CANADA, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20071025), ISBN 978-1-4244-1444-4, pages 562 - 567, XP031252765 [A] 1 * page 562, column L, paragraph 3 - page 565, column R, paragraph 3 * | Opposition | EP1571746 | WO2006066797 | DE10323722 | US2004059696 | WO2004031062 | WO2004038566 | - ROGERIO G. DE ALMEIDA et al., "Optimum Generation Control in Wind Parks When Carrying Out System Operator Re- quests", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER SYSTEMS, (20060500), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 718 - 725, XP055502741 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TPWRS.2005.861996 | - C.F.MOYANO et al., "Using an OPF like Approach to Define the Operational Strategy of a Wind Park under a System Operator Control", Power Tech, Lausanne, (20070800), pages 651 - 656, XP031269454 | - Beleg des Publikationsdatums, (20070800), URL: https://www.researchgate.net/publication/4341603_Using_an_OPF_like_Approach_to_ Defi- ne_the_Operational_Strategy_of_a_Wind_Park_under_a_System_Operator_Control? enrichld=rgreq-d9b1 e671 e9b11 08a9ea3e29f05350b67-XXX&enrichSource= Y292ZXJQYWdlOzQzN DE 2MDM7QVM6OTg3MDIwNTIwMzY2M DIAMTQwM DU0 MzgxMTQx | - DE BOE R et al., "OPTIMAL CONTROL OF WIND POWER PLANTS", Journal of Wind Engineering and Industrial Aerodynamics, (19880000), vol. 27, pages 237 - 246, XP055502759 | - CHRISTOPHER J. SPRUCE, Simulation and Control of Windfarms, (19930000), XP055502766 | - Anca D Hansen; Poul Sörensen; Florin Iov; Frede Blaabjerg, "Centralised power control of wind farm with doubly fed induction generators", Renewable Energy, (20050810), vol. 31, no. 7, pages 935 - 951, XP055093875 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.renene.2005.05.011 | - NAYEEM RAHIVIAT ULLAH et al., "Reactive Power Ancillary Service from Wind Farms", ELECTRICAL POWER CONFERENCE, CANADA, (20071025), ISBN 978-1 -4244-1444-4, pages 562 - 567, XP031252765 |