EP2235579 - EXTERNAL CAVITY TUNABLE LASER WITH AN AIR GAP ETALON COMPRISING WEDGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Renishaw PLC New Mills Wotton-Under-Edge Gloucestershire GL12 8JR / GB | [2010/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COPNER, Nigel Digital Technium Singleton Park Swansea SA2 8PP / GB | 02 /
EL DAHDAH, Nayla Digital Technium Singleton Park Swansea SA2 8PP / GB | [2014/28] |
Former [2013/34] | 01 /
COPNER, Nigel Digital Technium Singleton Park Swansea SA2 8PP / GB | ||
02 /
EL DAH DAH, Nayla Digital Technium Singleton Park Swansea SA2 8PP / GB | |||
Former [2010/40] | 01 /
COPNER, Nigel Digital Technium Singleton Park Swansea SA2 8PP / GB | ||
02 /
EL DAH DAH, Nayla Digital Technium Singleton Park Swansea SA2 8PP / GB | Representative(s) | Dunn, Paul Edward, et al Renishaw plc Patent Department New Mills Wotton-under-Edge, Glos. GL12 8JR / GB | [2010/40] | Application number, filing date | 08865429.8 | 22.12.2008 | [2010/40] | WO2008GB04253 | Priority number, date | GB20070024874 | 20.12.2007 Original published format: GB 0724874 | [2010/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009081160 | Date: | 02.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2235579 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2235579 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/00, H01S3/106, H01S5/14, H01S3/08 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
G02B26/001 (EP,US);
H01S3/1062 (EP,US);
H01S3/08036 (EP,US);
H01S5/141 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/40] | Title | German: | ABSTIMMBARER LASER MIT EXTERNEM RESONATOR UND LUFTSPALTETALON MIT KEILEN | [2010/40] | English: | EXTERNAL CAVITY TUNABLE LASER WITH AN AIR GAP ETALON COMPRISING WEDGES | [2010/40] | French: | LASER ACCORDABLE À CAVITÉ EXTERNE AVEC ÉTALON À LAME D'AIR COMPRENANT DES COINS | [2010/40] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/40] | 31.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.06.2013 | 17.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.11.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 14.11.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/04] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.08.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 22.08.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.09.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2008 | AT | 12.02.2014 | BE | 12.02.2014 | BG | 12.02.2014 | CY | 12.02.2014 | CZ | 12.02.2014 | DK | 12.02.2014 | EE | 12.02.2014 | ES | 12.02.2014 | FI | 12.02.2014 | HR | 12.02.2014 | LT | 12.02.2014 | LV | 12.02.2014 | MC | 12.02.2014 | MT | 12.02.2014 | NL | 12.02.2014 | PL | 12.02.2014 | RO | 12.02.2014 | SE | 12.02.2014 | SI | 12.02.2014 | SK | 12.02.2014 | TR | 12.02.2014 | NO | 12.05.2014 | GR | 13.05.2014 | IS | 12.06.2014 | PT | 12.06.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 22.12.2008 | |
AT | 12.02.2014 | ||
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
TR | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
GR | 13.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
MC | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
BG | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SI | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
PL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
SK | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
RO | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
CZ | 12.02.2014 | ||
DK | 12.02.2014 | ||
EE | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/42] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
BE | 12.02.2014 | ||
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
HR | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
LV | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/39] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
NL | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 12.02.2014 | |
CY | 12.02.2014 | ||
ES | 12.02.2014 | ||
FI | 12.02.2014 | ||
LT | 12.02.2014 | ||
SE | 12.02.2014 | ||
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | ||
PT | 12.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | LT | 12.02.2014 | |
NO | 12.05.2014 | ||
IS | 12.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2004109487 (ZHANG GUANGZHI G [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0027] - [0063] - [0067] - [0072]; figures 1-4,6 * [Y] 16-20; | [XY]US2005105565 (TOBIASON JOSEPH D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,12-14,16-20 * paragraphs [0045] - [0079] - [0095] - [0117]; figures 1-3,13-18 * [Y] 16-20; | [X]US6049554 (LANG ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 5, line 20 - column 8, line 46; figures 2,5,7-9 * * column 9, lines 17-65 * | by applicant | US2005008045 | US2004109487 |