EP2239230 - BURNED COMPOSITE METAL OXIDE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2010/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKI, Kazuo c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334 Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 02 /
SAWAI, Minoru c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334 Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 03 /
KITAYAMA, Hiroaki c/o Kao Corporation Research Laboratories 1334 Minato Wakayama-shi Wakayama 640-8580 / JP | 04 /
SAITO, Takamitsu c/o NISSAN Motor Co., Ltd., IP Department, 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 05 /
MIURA, Tamaki c/o NISSAN Motor Co., Ltd., IP Department, 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa 243-0123 / JP | 06 /
WATANABE, Kyoichi c/o NISSAN Motor Co., Ltd., IP Department, 1-1, Morinosatoaoyama, Atsugi-shi Kanagawa, 243-0123 / JP | [2010/41] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/41] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08865587.3 | 03.12.2008 | [2010/41] | WO2008JP71957 | Priority number, date | JP20070332550 | 25.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007332550 | JP20070332592 | 25.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007332592 | [2010/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009081703 | Date: | 02.07.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2239230 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2016 | Classification | IPC: | C01G45/00, H01M4/505 | [2017/01] | CPC: |
C01G1/02 (EP,US);
C01G45/1242 (EP,US);
H01M4/505 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2004/34 (EP,US);
C01P2004/50 (EP,US);
C01P2004/61 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2006/10 (EP,US);
C01P2006/12 (EP,US);
C01P2006/14 (EP,US);
C01P2006/16 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/41] | C01G45/00, C01G49/00, C01G51/00, C01G53/00, H01M4/48, H01M4/50, H01M4/52 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/41] | Title | German: | Verbranntes Verbundmetalloxid und sein Herstellungsverfahren | [2010/41] | English: | BURNED COMPOSITE METAL OXIDE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2010/41] | French: | OXYDE MÉTALLIQUE COMPOSITE BRÛLÉ ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2010/41] | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2010 | Translation filed | 09.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 09.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 04.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 09.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2004155631 (DAINIPPON TORYO KK) [X] 1,2,4,6-10,12,14-16 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039]; example 1 * [I] 5,13; | [XI]JP2007238434 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-12,14,15 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034]; example 1 * [I] 5,13; | [A]JP2007005238 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0084] *; | [A]EP1492180 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0087] - paragraph [0092]; example 1 *; | [A]US2007264573 (YAMADA RYOJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0043] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0072] * * page 1, paragraph 80 - paragraph 81 * | International search | [X]JP2005123179 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [Y]JP2004161526 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [Y]JP2000072443 (UBE INDUSTRIES); | [Y]JP2005158401 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) | by applicant | JP2003048719 | JPH1083816 | JP2002151079 | JPH10106562 |