EP2252689 - USE OF ANTI-CONNEXIN POLYNUCLEOTIDES FOR THE TREATMENT OF SURGICAL ADHESIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ocunexus Therapeutics, Inc. 12481 High Bluff Drive, Suite 150 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2018/01] |
Former [2017/52] | For all designated states Ocunexus Therapeutics, Inc. 12520 High Bluff Drive, Suite 350 San Diego, CA 92130 / US | ||
Former [2013/50] | For all designated states Coda Therapeutics, Inc. 12520 High Bluff Drive Suite 350 San Diego CA 92130 / US | ||
Former [2010/47] | For all designated states Coda Therapeutics, Inc. 10505 Sorrento Valley Road, Suite 395 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BECKER, David, L. 19 Lapwing Way Abbots Langley Hertfordshire WD5 OGG / GB | 02 /
GREEN, Colin, R. 3/4 Crescent Road 1023 Epson Auckland / NL | 03 /
DUFT, Bradford, J. P.o. Box 1133 Rancho Santa Fe CA 92067 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | 01 /
BECKER, David, L. 19 Lapwing Way Abbots Langley Hertfordshire WD5 OGG / GB | ||
02 /
GREEN, Colin, R. 3/4 Crescent Road NL-1023 Epson Auckland / NL | |||
03 /
DUFT, Bradford, J. P.o. Box 1133 Rancho Santa Fe CA 92067 / US | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/47] | Tuxworth, Pamela M. J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08866069.1 | 22.12.2008 | [2010/47] | WO2008US14024 | Priority number, date | US20070008748P | 21.12.2007 Original published format: US 8748 P | [2010/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009085273 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2252689 | Date: | 24.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/04, A61L31/14, A61K9/00, A61K47/10, A61K47/16, C12N15/11, C12N15/113 | [2017/30] | CPC: |
C12N15/1138 (EP,US);
A61K47/10 (EP,US);
A61K47/12 (EP,US);
A61K47/16 (EP,US);
A61K47/186 (EP,US);
A61K47/36 (EP,US);
A61K47/38 (EP,US);
A61K9/0014 (EP,US);
A61K9/06 (EP,US);
A61K9/7007 (EP,US);
A61L31/042 (EP,US);
A61L31/145 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P41/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A01K2207/05 (EP,US);
A01K2207/30 (EP,US);
A01K2227/10 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2227/107 (EP,US);
A01K2267/03 (EP,US);
C12N2310/11 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/47] | C12N15/11 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/47] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON ANTI-CONNEXIN-POLYNUKLEOTIDEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG CHIRURGISCHER ADHÄSIONEN | [2010/47] | English: | USE OF ANTI-CONNEXIN POLYNUCLEOTIDES FOR THE TREATMENT OF SURGICAL ADHESIONS | [2010/47] | French: | UTILISATION DE POLYNUCLÉOTIDES ANTI-CONNEXINE POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'ADHÉRENCES POST-CHIRURGICALES | [2010/47] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/47] | 18.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.05.2014 | 08.05.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 15.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 22.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/22] | 16.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/22] | Appeal following examination | 12.09.2014 | Appeal received No. T0177/15 | 25.11.2014 | Statement of grounds filed | 07.04.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2012 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.05.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 12.05.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.05.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.04.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 08.04.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 29.04.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 12.07.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.07.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.07.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [E]WO2009075882 (CODA THERAPEUTICS INC [US], et al) [E] 1-52 * see claims and Seq.1-12 *; | [XY]WO2006134494 (CODA THERAPEUTICS LTD [NZ], et al) [X] 33-45 * see claims * [Y] 1-52; | [XY]WO0044409 (UNIV LONDON [GB], et al) [X] 33-45 * see claims * [Y] 1-52; | [XY] - QIU C ET AL, "Targeting Connexin43 Expression Accelerates the Rate of Wound Repair", CURRENT BIOLOGY, CURRENT SCIENCE, GB, (20030930), vol. 13, no. 19, ISSN 0960-9822, pages 1697 - 1703, XP004545249 [X] 33-45 * abstract * [Y] 1-52 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cub.2003.09.007 | [XY] - MORI RYOICHI ET AL, "Acute downregulation of connexin43 at wound sites leads to a reduced inflammatory response, enhanced keratinocyte proliferation and wound fibroblast migration", JOURNAL OF CELL SCIENCE, CAMBRIDGE UNIVERSITY PRESS, LONDON, GB, (20061201), vol. 119, no. 24, ISSN 0021-9533, pages 5193 - 5203, XP002529576 [X] 33-45 * the whole document * [Y] 1-52 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1242/jcs.03320 | Examination | - LIU YANCHIN ET AL, "Crosslinked hyaluronan hydrogels containing mitomycin C reduce postoperative abdominal adhesions", FERTILITY AND STERILITY, (200504), vol. 83, doi:doi:10.1016/j.fertnstert.2004.09.038, ISSN 0015-0282, pages 1275 - 1283, XP005162787 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fertnstert.2004.09.038 |