EP2232527 - BUFFER BILAYERS FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.12.2015 [2015/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HSU, Che-hsiung 4803 Mermaid Boulevard Wilmington, DE 19808 / US | 02 /
GAO, Weiying 223 Chaingate Circle Landenberg, PA 19350 / US | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Towler, Philip Dean, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Hoffmann, Benjamin Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 08866235.8 | 23.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008US88089 | Priority number, date | US20070016851 | 27.12.2007 Original published format: US 16851 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009086337 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2232527 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/00, H01L51/50, H01L51/52 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
H10K50/17 (EP,US);
H10K50/81 (EP,US);
H10K2102/103 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24893 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31533 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3154 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2010/39] | H01L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | PUFFERDOPPELSCHICHTEN FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE GERÄTE | [2010/39] | English: | BUFFER BILAYERS FOR ELECTRONIC DEVICES | [2010/39] | French: | BICOUCHES TAMPONS POUR DISPOSITIFS ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 06.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 11.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/49] | 09.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007002681 (DU PONT [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 36, lines 3-8,10,11; examples 1,3 *; | [Y]WO2007002740 (DU PONT [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 3, lines 19-32; figure 1; examples 1-8 * * page 22, lines 22-27 ** page 41; compounds VF2, PSEBVE * | International search | [A]US6210790 (CRIVELLO JAMES VINCENT [US]); | [Y]US6337370 (BAE BYEONG SOO [KR], et al); | [Y]US7112369 (WANG XIAORONG [US], et al); | [Y]US2006289843 (HSU CHE-HSIUNG [US], et al); | [A]US7166010 (LAMANSKY SERGEY A [US], et al); | [A]US7244797 (KURIHARA MASAAKI [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2007120143 (DU PONT [US], et al) |