EP2232800 - DE-EMPHASIS CIRCUIT FOR A VOLTAGE MODE DRIVER USED TO COMMUNICATE VIA A DIFFERENTIAL COMMUNICATION LINK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Micro Devices, Inc. One Amd Place Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIANG, Yikai 22378 Salem Ave. C Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | 02 /
BOMDICA, Arvind 1405 Cree Road Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 03 /
XU, Min 2400 El Camino Real Suite 1009 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 04 /
LEE, Ming-ju 1238 Mayberry Lane San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2011/52] |
Former [2010/39] | 01 /
LIANG, Yikai 22378 Salem Ave. C Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | ||
02 /
BOMDICA, Arvind 1405 Cree Road Fremont, CA 94539 / US | |||
03 /
XU, Min 2400 El Camino Real 510 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | |||
04 /
LEE, Ming-ju 1238 Mayberry Lane San Jose, CA 95131 / US | Representative(s) | Robinson, David Edward Ashdown, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester M1 4HD / GB | [2017/11] |
Former [2014/26] | Kenrick, Mark Lloyd, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 1 New York Street Manchester, M1 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2012/35] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2010/39] | Reeve, Anna Elizabeth Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 08866328.1 | 23.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008US88169 | Priority number, date | US20070017308 | 28.12.2007 Original published format: US 17308 | US20080032741 | 18.02.2008 Original published format: US 32741 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009086379 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2232800 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2232800 | Date: | 15.03.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/00, H04L1/08, H04L25/02 | [2016/43] | CPC: |
H03K19/0019 (EP,US);
H04L1/08 (EP,US);
H04L25/0272 (EP,US);
H04L25/0286 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/39] | H04L25/02, H04L1/08, H04L1/18, H03K17/693 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/11] |
Former [2010/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DE-EMPHASESCHALTUNG FÜR EINEN IN SPANNUNGSMODUS ARBEITENDEN TREIBER ZUR KOMMUNIKATION MITTELS EINER DIFFERENTIELLEN KOMMUNIKATIONSVERBINDUNG | [2016/43] | English: | DE-EMPHASIS CIRCUIT FOR A VOLTAGE MODE DRIVER USED TO COMMUNICATE VIA A DIFFERENTIAL COMMUNICATION LINK | [2010/39] | French: | CIRCUIT DE DÉSACCENTUATION POUR UN PILOTE EN MODE TENSION UTILISÉ POUR COMMUNIQUER VIA UNE LIAISON DE COMMUNICATION DIFFÉRENTIELLE | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/39] | DEEMPHASIS-SCHALTUNG FÜR EINEN SPANNUNGSMODUSTREIBER FÜR DIE KOMMUNIKATION ÜBER EINE DIFFERENZIELLE KOMMUNIKATIONSVERBINDUNG | Entry into regional phase | 15.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 15.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 20.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 01.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.03.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 19.03.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.03.2014 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2008 | AT | 15.03.2017 | CY | 15.03.2017 | CZ | 15.03.2017 | DK | 15.03.2017 | EE | 15.03.2017 | ES | 15.03.2017 | FI | 15.03.2017 | HR | 15.03.2017 | IT | 15.03.2017 | LT | 15.03.2017 | LV | 15.03.2017 | MC | 15.03.2017 | NL | 15.03.2017 | PL | 15.03.2017 | RO | 15.03.2017 | SE | 15.03.2017 | SI | 15.03.2017 | SK | 15.03.2017 | TR | 15.03.2017 | BG | 15.06.2017 | NO | 15.06.2017 | GR | 16.06.2017 | IS | 15.07.2017 | PT | 17.07.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.12.2008 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CY | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.12.2008 | |
AT | 15.03.2017 | ||
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
MC | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SI | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
DK | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
PT | 17.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
PL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 15.03.2017 | |
CZ | 15.03.2017 | ||
EE | 15.03.2017 | ||
ES | 15.03.2017 | ||
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
RO | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
SK | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
IS | 15.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | CZ | 15.03.2017 | |
FI | 15.03.2017 | ||
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 15.03.2017 | |
HR | 15.03.2017 | ||
LT | 15.03.2017 | ||
LV | 15.03.2017 | ||
NL | 15.03.2017 | ||
SE | 15.03.2017 | ||
BG | 15.06.2017 | ||
NO | 15.06.2017 | ||
GR | 16.06.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006071689 (POECHMUELLER PETER [DE]) [A] 1-20* paragraphs [0032] - [0038] *; | [A]US2007103220 (KIM DONG-HWAN [KR], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0062] - [0080] *; | [X]US2007139086 (LIU CHIH-MIN [TW]) [X] 1-3,5,6,10,11,15,17 * paragraphs [0022] - [0047] * | by applicant | US2007139086 |