EP2226635 - IMMUNODETECTION ASSAY FOR MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS COMPLEX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.01.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BL Co., Ltd 6-26, Kanda-cho Numazu-shi Shizuoka 410-0042 / JP | [2010/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAMBA, Yasuharu c/o BL CO. LTD. 6-26, Kanda-cho Numazu-shi Shizuoka 410-0042 / JP | [2013/11] |
Former [2010/36] | 01 /
NAMBA, Yasuharu c/o BL CO. LTD. 6-26, Kanda-cho Numazu-shi Shizuoka 410-0042 / JP | Representative(s) | Eidelsberg, Olivier Nathan, et al Cabinet Flechner 22, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/36] | Eidelsberg, Olivier Nathan, et al Cabinet Flechner 22, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 08866382.8 | 19.12.2008 | [2010/36] | WO2008JP73200 | Priority number, date | JP20070339376 | 28.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007339376 | [2010/36] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009084481 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2226635 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2226635 | Date: | 13.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/569, C07K16/12, G01N33/53, G01N33/543, G01N33/548, G01N33/553, C12P21/08, A61K47/48 | [2012/27] | CPC: |
C07K16/1289 (EP,US);
G01N33/5695 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/36] | G01N33/569, C07K16/12, G01N33/53, G01N33/543, G01N33/548, G01N33/553, C12P21/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | IMMUNDETEKTIONSTEST FÜR MYCOBACTERIUM-TUBERCULOSIS-KOMPLEX | [2010/36] | English: | IMMUNODETECTION ASSAY FOR MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS COMPLEX | [2010/36] | French: | TEST D'IMMUNODÉTECTION DU COMPLEXE MYCOBACTERIUM TUBERCULOSIS | [2010/36] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2010 | Translation filed | 23.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 23.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 30.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.12.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2008 | AT | 13.03.2013 | BE | 13.03.2013 | CY | 13.03.2013 | CZ | 13.03.2013 | DK | 13.03.2013 | EE | 13.03.2013 | FI | 13.03.2013 | HR | 13.03.2013 | IT | 13.03.2013 | LT | 13.03.2013 | LV | 13.03.2013 | MC | 13.03.2013 | MT | 13.03.2013 | NL | 13.03.2013 | PL | 13.03.2013 | RO | 13.03.2013 | SE | 13.03.2013 | SI | 13.03.2013 | SK | 13.03.2013 | TR | 13.03.2013 | BG | 13.06.2013 | NO | 13.06.2013 | GR | 14.06.2013 | ES | 24.06.2013 | IS | 13.07.2013 | PT | 15.07.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 19.12.2008 | |
AT | 13.03.2013 | ||
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
TR | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
TR | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
MC | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
IT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
DK | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CY | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
PL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
CZ | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
RO | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
SK | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 13.03.2013 | |
BE | 13.03.2013 | ||
EE | 13.03.2013 | ||
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
NL | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
IS | 13.07.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | BE | 13.03.2013 | |
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
PT | 15.07.2013 | ||
Former [2013/44] | BE | 13.03.2013 | |
FI | 13.03.2013 | ||
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
HR | 13.03.2013 | ||
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
LV | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 13.03.2013 | |
LT | 13.03.2013 | ||
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
SI | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
GR | 14.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
ES | 24.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
SE | 13.03.2013 | ||
BG | 13.06.2013 | ||
NO | 13.06.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 13.03.2013 | |
NO | 13.06.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]CN101294964 (UNIV FUDAN AF HUASHAN HOSPITAL [CN]) [AP] 1-15* the whole document *; | [A] - WANG ET AL, "Performance assessment of the Capilia TB assay and the BD ProbeTec ET system for rapid culture confirmation of Mycobacterium tuberculosis", DIAGNOSTIC MICROBIOLOGY AND INFECTIOUS DISEASES, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHING CO., AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071201), vol. 59, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.DIAGMICROBIO.2007.06.010, ISSN 0732-8893, pages 395 - 399, XP022373413 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.diagmicrobio.2007.06.010 | International search | [A]JPH01247094 (AJINOMOTO KK, et al); | [A]JPH11514217 (CORIXA CORP.); | [A]JP2007316078 (TOWNS KK) | by applicant | JPH07110332 | JPH11108931 | - ABE C. ET AL., "Simple and Rapid Identification of the Mycobacterium tuberculosis Complex by Immunochromatographic Assay Using Anti-MPB64 Monoclonal Antibodies", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, (199911), pages 3693 - 3697, XP002241048 |