EP2222240 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ORTHOPEDIC FRACTURE FIXATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Georgy, Bassem 5458 Coach Lane San Diego, CA 92130 / US | For all designated states Ghobial, Eman K. R. 5458 Coach Lane San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2010/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/35] | Representative(s) | Sevinç, Erkan, et al Istanbul Patent A.S. Plaza-33, Büyükdere Cad. No: 33/16 Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Sevinç, Erkan, et al Istanbul Patent & Trademark Consultancy Ltd. Patent Plaza-33, Büyükdere cad. No: 33/16, Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | Application number, filing date | 08866720.9 | 18.12.2008 | [2010/35] | WO2008US87552 | Priority number, date | US20070014748 | 19.12.2007 Original published format: US 14748 | [2010/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009086024 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2222240 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70, A61B17/86 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
A61B17/7001 (EP,US);
A61B17/7098 (EP,US);
A61B17/864 (EP,US);
A61F2/442 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30331 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30484 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30579 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30594 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30604 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30736 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30784 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30841 (EP,US);
A61F2002/448 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00017 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00023 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/35] | A61B17/86 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/35] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR FIXATION ORTHOPÄDISCHER FRAKTUREN | [2010/35] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR ORTHOPEDIC FRACTURE FIXATION | [2010/35] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA FIXATION D'UNE FRACTURE ORTHOPÉDIQUE | [2010/35] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/35] | 01.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/48] | 08.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2005015061 (SWEENEY PATRICK J [US]) [Y] 1-12 * page 4, paragraph 52 - page 5, paragraph 58 * * page 6, paragraph 67 * * page 7, paragraph 76 * * figures 1-5b, 8a, 24, 25 *; | [Y]WO03007830 (EXPANDING ORTHOPEDICS INC [US]) [Y] 1-12 * page 11, line 31 - page 12, line 25 * * page 15, line 16 - page 16, line 15 * * figures 6A-6B, 9A-9B *; | [YA]FR2820630 (BENAZZOUZ KARIM [FR]) [Y] 8 * page 5, line 36 - page 6, line 4 * * page 11, lines 9-18 * * figures 1-5b * [A] 1; | [A]US2004193162 (BRAMLET DALE G [US], et al) [A] 1,4 * page 2, paragraphs 27-28 * * figures 2, 5, 6 * | International search | [Y]US2005015059 (SWEENEY PATRICK J [US]); | [Y]US2004059328 (DANIEL STEVEN A [US], et al); | [A]US2006122624 (TRUCKAI CSABA [US], et al); | [A]US2005059972 (BISCUP ROBERT S [US]) |