EP2224937 - COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING AND TREATING HYPERLIPIDEMIA COMPRISING THE EXTRACT OF LYSIMACHIAE FOENUM-GRAECI HERBA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/36] | COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING AND TREATING METABOLIC DISEASES COMPRISING THE EXTRACT OF LYSIMACHIAE FOENUM-GRAECI HERBA | ||
[2014/50] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRNSCIENCE CO., LTD. 602, Bedel Hoeikwan building 324-1, Yangjae-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-130 / KR | [2010/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEO, Jong-Bae 181-425, Sadang 5-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-095 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Jae-Young 101, Tandyhouse 4-cha 180-597, Bongcheon 11-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-050 / KR | 03 /
CHOI, Sun-Mi 235-4, Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-010 / KR | 04 /
PARK, Sang-Wook 204, 1641-69 Sillimbon-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-029 / KR | 05 /
CHOE, Sung-Sik 361-16, Gunja-dong Gwangjin-gu Seoul 143-840 / KR | 06 /
CHOI, Eun-Wook 106-1205 Sintree Apt. 1-danji Sinjeong 3-dong Yangcheon-gu Seoul 158-073 / KR | 07 /
SEEN, Dong-Seung 1006-803 Irwonsuwonmangpo Jugong Apt. 447 Mangpo-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-400 / KR | 08 /
LEE, Tae-Gyu 5th Floor, DONGSUNG Bldg. 61 Banpo-daero 20-gil Seochogu (Seochodong) Seoul 137-874 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | 01 /
SEO, Jong-Bae 181-425, Sadang 5-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-095 / KR | ||
02 /
PARK, Jae-Young 101 Tandyhouse 4-cha 180-597, Bongcheon 11-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-050 / KR | |||
03 /
CHOI, Sun-Mi 235-4, Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-010 / KR | |||
04 /
PARK, Sang-Wook 204, 1641-69 Sillimbon-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-029 / KR | |||
05 /
CHOE, Sung-Sik 361-16, Gunja-dong Gwangjin-gu Seoul 143-840 / KR | |||
06 /
CHOI, Eun-Wook 106-1205 Sintree Apt. 1-danji Sinjeong 3-dong Yangcheon-gu Seoul 158-073 / KR | |||
07 /
SEEN, Dong-Seung 1006-803 Irwonsuwonmangpo Jugong Apt. 447 Mangpo-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-400 / KR | |||
08 /
LEE, Tae-Gyu 5th Floor, DONGSUNG Bldg. 61 Banpo-daero 20-gil Seochogu (Seochodong) Seoul 137-874 / KR | |||
Former [2010/36] | 01 /
SEO, Jong-Bae 181-425, Sadang 5-dong Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-095 / KR | ||
02 /
PARK, Jae-Young 101 Tandyhouse 4-cha 180-597, Bongcheon 11-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-050 / KR | |||
03 /
CHOI, Sun-Mi 235-4, Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-010 / KR | |||
04 /
PARK, Sang-Wook 204, 1641-69 Sillimbon-dong Gwanak-gu Seoul 151-029 / KR | |||
05 /
CHOE, Sung-Sik 361-16, Gunja-dong Gwangjin-gu Seoul 143-840 / KR | |||
06 /
CHOI, Eun-Wook 106-1205 Sintree Apt. 1-danji Sinjeong 3-dong Yangcheon-gu Seoul 158-073 / KR | |||
07 /
SEEN, Dong-Seung 1006-803 Irwonsuwonmangpo Jugong Apt. 447 Mangpo-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-400 / KR | |||
08 /
LEE, Tae-Gyu 306-202 Hansolmaeul Apt. 731 Irwon-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-942 / KR | Representative(s) | Hocking, Adrian Niall, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Glos. GL50 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Hocking, Adrian Niall, et al Albright Patents LLP Eagle Tower Montpellier Drive Cheltenham GL50 1TA / GB | ||
Former [2012/07] | Schweiger, Martin, et al Schweiger & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Karlstrasse 35 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/36] | Read, David Graham W. P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | Application number, filing date | 08866935.3 | 26.12.2008 | [2010/36] | WO2008KR07706 | Priority number, date | KR20070140988 | 28.12.2007 Original published format: KR 20070140988 | [2010/36] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009084875 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2224937 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 20.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K36/185, A61P3/06, A61P3/10, A61P1/16, A61P9/10 | [2013/03] | CPC: |
A61K36/185 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/36] | A61K36/185 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON HYPERLIPIDÄMIE MIT EINEM EXTRAKT AUS LYSIMACHIA FOENUM-GRAECUM | [2014/50] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING AND TREATING HYPERLIPIDEMIA COMPRISING THE EXTRACT OF LYSIMACHIAE FOENUM-GRAECI HERBA | [2014/50] | French: | COMPOSITION DE PREVENTION ET DE TRAITEMENT DE L'HYPERLIPIDEMIE COMPRENANT UN EXTRAIT DE LYSIMACHIAE FOENUM-GRAECI HERBA | [2014/52] |
Former [2010/36] | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR VORBEUGUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON STOFFWECHSELERKRANKUNGEN MIT EINEM EXTRAKT AUS LYSIMACHIA FOENUM-GRAECUM | ||
Former [2010/36] | COMPOSITION FOR PREVENTING AND TREATING METABOLIC DISEASES COMPRISING THE EXTRACT OF LYSIMACHIAE FOENUM-GRAECI HERBA | ||
Former [2010/36] | COMPOSITION DE PRÉVENTION ET DE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES MÉTABOLIQUES COMPRENANT UN EXTRAIT DE LYSIMACHIAE FOENUM-GRAECI HERBA | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 16.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/42] | 15.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]CN101002888 ; | [I]CN1977872 ; | [XP]WO2008150068 (NEWGEX INC [KR], et al) [XP] 3,5 * claims 1-6 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2008, no. 04, Database accession no. 2008-A50573, XP002688863 & CN101002888 A 20070725 (CHEN W) [X] 3,5 * abstract * | [I] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 22, Database accession no. 2007-214844, XP002688864 & CN1977872 A 20070613 (DING Q) [I] 1-3,5 * abstract * | International search | [A]KR20000010275 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20010003366 (BAK JAE JOON [KR], et al); | [A]KR20060033068 (KIM ANDREW TAIKYUN [KR]); | [A]KR20060119047 (JANG SEONG PAL [KR]) |