EP2227677 - MEASURING SYSTEM FOR A MEDIUM FLOWING IN A PROCESS LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Endress+Hauser Flowtec AG Kägenstrasse 7 4153 Reinach / CH | [2010/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HÖCKER, Rainer Kalvarienbergstrasse 22 79761 Waldshut / DE | [2010/37] | Representative(s) | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser Group Services (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG Colmarer Straße 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/28] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | ||
Former [2010/37] | Andres, Angelika Maria Endress+Hauser (Deutschland) AG+Co. KG PatServe Colmarer Strasse 6 79576 Weil am Rhein / DE | Application number, filing date | 08866984.1 | 22.12.2008 | [2010/37] | WO2008EP68165 | Priority number, date | DE20071063372 | 30.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007063372 | [2010/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009083533 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2227677 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2227677 | Date: | 12.07.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01F15/18 | [2010/37] | CPC: |
G01F1/3209 (EP);
G01F1/58 (EP);
G01F1/662 (EP);
G01F15/00 (EP);
G01F15/185 (EP);
G01N11/02 (EP);
G01N9/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/28] |
Former [2010/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MEßSYSTEM FÜR EIN IN EINER PROZESSLEITUNG STRÖMENDES MEDIUM | [2010/37] | English: | MEASURING SYSTEM FOR A MEDIUM FLOWING IN A PROCESS LINE | [2010/37] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MESURE POUR UN FLUIDE S'ÉCOULANT DANS UNE CONDUITE DE PROCESSUS | [2010/37] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 07.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 13.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2008 | CY | 12.07.2017 | CZ | 12.07.2017 | DK | 12.07.2017 | EE | 12.07.2017 | ES | 12.07.2017 | FI | 12.07.2017 | HR | 12.07.2017 | IT | 12.07.2017 | LT | 12.07.2017 | LV | 12.07.2017 | MC | 12.07.2017 | MT | 12.07.2017 | NL | 12.07.2017 | PL | 12.07.2017 | PT | 12.07.2017 | RO | 12.07.2017 | SE | 12.07.2017 | SI | 12.07.2017 | SK | 12.07.2017 | TR | 12.07.2017 | BG | 12.10.2017 | NO | 12.10.2017 | GR | 13.10.2017 | IS | 12.11.2017 | AT | 22.12.2017 | IE | 22.12.2017 | LU | 22.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 22.12.2008 | |
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
TR | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
AT | 22.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 22.12.2008 | |
CY | 12.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
AT | 22.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 22.12.2008 | |
CZ | 12.07.2017 | ||
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
AT | 22.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MC | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
AT | 22.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/23] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
AT | 22.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
IE | 22.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
MT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
LU | 22.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SI | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
IT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
EE | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
RO | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
SK | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 12.07.2017 | |
DK | 12.07.2017 | ||
ES | 12.07.2017 | ||
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 12.07.2017 | |
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
LV | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | ES | 12.07.2017 | |
FI | 12.07.2017 | ||
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
PL | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
BG | 12.10.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
GR | 13.10.2017 | ||
IS | 12.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
HR | 12.07.2017 | ||
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
SE | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 12.07.2017 | |
LT | 12.07.2017 | ||
NL | 12.07.2017 | ||
NO | 12.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 12.07.2017 | |
NO | 12.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005262937 (EMMERT CHARLES G JR [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0033] - [0036]; figures 5-17 *; | [A]EP0908704 (DENSO CORP [JP]) [A] 1-36 * paragraphs [0003] , [0006] - [0008] - [0015] - [0022]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5013883 (FUIMEFREDDO ANTHONY J [US], et al) [A] 1-36 * column 3, line 24 - line 46; figures 1,2 * |