EP2225101 - NANO-STRUCTURED REFRACTORY METALS, METAL CARBIDES, AND COATINGS AND PARTS FABRICATED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Corporation 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | [2014/48] |
Former [2010/36] | For all designated states Lockheed Martin Corporation 6801 Rockledge Drive Bethesda, MD 20817 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZINN, Alfred, A. 1073 Maddux Drive Palo Alto CA 94303 / US | [2010/36] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2014/48] |
Former [2013/44] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstraße 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/36] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Straße 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08867229.0 | 02.09.2008 | [2010/36] | WO2008US75049 | Priority number, date | US20070017098P | 27.12.2007 Original published format: US 17098 P | US20080191975 | 14.08.2008 Original published format: US 191975 | [2010/40] |
Former [2010/36] | US20070017098 | 27.12.2007 | |
US20080191975 | 14.08.2008 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009085342 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2225101 | Date: | 08.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2225101 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B32B9/00, B22F9/00, B22F3/10, B22F7/04, B22F1/00 | [2011/19] | CPC: |
B22F3/1021 (EP,US);
B05D3/0254 (US);
B22F1/0545 (EP,US);
B22F7/04 (EP,US);
B22F9/24 (EP,US);
B29C67/04 (US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/90 (EP,US);
C01B32/914 (EP,US);
C04B35/56 (EP,US);
C04B35/5607 (EP,US);
C04B35/5611 (EP,US);
C04B35/5622 (EP,US);
C04B35/5626 (EP,US);
C04B35/573 (EP,US);
C04B35/575 (EP,US);
C04B35/632 (EP,US);
C04B35/645 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B41/5057 (EP,US);
C04B41/5061 (EP,US);
C04B41/5133 (EP,US);
C04B41/87 (EP,US);
C04B41/88 (EP,US);
C23C24/08 (EP,US);
C23C26/00 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/522 (US,EP);
C04B41/009, C04B35/83 (US,EP);
C04B41/5057, C04B41/4539, C04B41/4549, C04B41/455 (US,EP);
C04B41/5061, C04B41/4539, C04B41/4549, C04B41/455 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2010/36] | B32B9/00, B22F9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/36] | Title | German: | NANOSTRUKTURIERTE FEUERFESTE METALLE UND METALLCARBIDE SOWIE DARAUS HERGESTELLTE BESCHICHTUNGEN UND TEILE | [2010/36] | English: | NANO-STRUCTURED REFRACTORY METALS, METAL CARBIDES, AND COATINGS AND PARTS FABRICATED THEREFROM | [2010/36] | French: | MÉTAUX RÉFRACTAIRES NANOSTRUCTURÉS, CARBURES DE MÉTAL ET REVÊTEMENTS ET PIÈCES FABRIQUÉS À PARTIR DE CEUX-CI | [2010/36] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2010 | Search fee paid | 17.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/36] | 30.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13188147.6 / EP2687365 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   25.10.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.09.2008 | AT | 26.11.2014 | BE | 26.11.2014 | BG | 26.11.2014 | CY | 26.11.2014 | CZ | 26.11.2014 | DK | 26.11.2014 | EE | 26.11.2014 | ES | 26.11.2014 | FI | 26.11.2014 | HR | 26.11.2014 | IT | 26.11.2014 | LT | 26.11.2014 | LV | 26.11.2014 | MC | 26.11.2014 | MT | 26.11.2014 | NL | 26.11.2014 | PL | 26.11.2014 | RO | 26.11.2014 | SE | 26.11.2014 | SI | 26.11.2014 | SK | 26.11.2014 | TR | 26.11.2014 | NO | 26.02.2015 | GR | 27.02.2015 | IS | 26.03.2015 | PT | 26.03.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 02.09.2008 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 26.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0960675 (TOMOE WORKS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * example 6; claims 1-7 *; | [A]EP1683592 (HARIMA CHEMICALS INC [JP]) [A] 1-8* examples 11-16 *; | [A]US2007175296 (SUBRAMANIAN VIVEK [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0005] - [0007]; claims 1-9 * | International search | [Y]US3713865 (LEEDS D); | [Y]US4835002 (WOLF PETER A [US], et al); | [Y]US2002025294 (DUGGER CORTLAND OTIS [US]); | [Y]US2003086859 (KAWAKAMI SOICHIRO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2005008880 (KUNZE KLAUS [US], et al); | [Y]US6846565 (KORGEL BRIAN A [US], et al); | [Y]US6875374 (ZHAN GUODONG [US], et al); | [X]US2005129580 (SWINEHART PHILIP R [US], et al); | [A]US2007167019 (ZURCHER FABIO [US], et al); | [A]US2007212538 (NIU CHUNMING [US]) | by applicant | US2005008880 |