EP2243227 - COMMUNICATION BY RETURN PATHWAY FROM A TERMINAL TO A TRANSMITTER FOR REDUCING IN PARTICULAR INTERFERENCE BETWEEN BEAMS FROM THE TRANSMITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orange 78, rue Olivier de Serres 75015 Paris / FR | [2013/39] |
Former [2010/43] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALZER, Thomas 150 avenue de Verdun F-92130 Issy Les Moulineaux / FR | 02 /
KOUNTOURIS, Marios 1000 San Marcos Street Apt. 201 Austin Texas 78702 / US | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08867695.2 | 12.12.2008 | [2010/43] | WO2008FR52293 | Priority number, date | FR20080050020 | 03.01.2008 Original published format: FR 0850020 | [2010/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009083680 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2243227 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/04 | [2010/43] | CPC: |
H04B7/0417 (EP,US);
H04B7/0452 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/43] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATION ÜBER DEN RÜCKWEG VON EINEM ENDGERÄT AN EINEN SENDER ZUR VERMINDERUNG INSBESONDERE VON INTERFERENZEN ZWISCHEN STRAHLEN DES SENDERS | [2010/43] | English: | COMMUNICATION BY RETURN PATHWAY FROM A TERMINAL TO A TRANSMITTER FOR REDUCING IN PARTICULAR INTERFERENCE BETWEEN BEAMS FROM THE TRANSMITTER | [2010/43] | French: | COMMUNICATION PAR VOIE DE RETOUR D'UN TERMINAL VERS UN EMETTEUR POUR REDUIRE NOTAMMENT UNE INTERFERENCE ENTRE FAISCEAUX ISSUS DE L'EMETTEUR | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 24.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/47] | 28.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/47] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9600466 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract ** page 6, lines 1-12; claims 10-12,28-30 *; | [XA]EP1229669 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 1,8,9,13 * paragraphs [0018] , [0030] - [0033] - [0041] , [0046] , [0132] , [0133]; claims 14-16,18 * [A] 2-7,10-12; | [XA]WO02091779 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [X] 1,8,9,13 * page 4, line 27 - page 5, line 9 * * page 22, line 14 - page 25, line 11 * * page 26, line 10 - page 27, line 15; claims 18-23,25 * [A] 2-7,10-12; | [XA]US2004137949 (HARRIS MARK [US]) [X] 1,8,9,13 * abstract * [A] 2-7,10-12; | [DA]FR2893468 (FRANCE TELECOM [FR]) [DA] 1-12 * page 1, lines 1-28 * * page 2, lines 9-12; claim 1 * |