EP2232315 - METHODS AND APPARATUS RELATED TO A LAUNCH CONNECTOR PORTION OF A URETEROSCOPE LASER-ENERGY-DELIVERY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.2013 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311-1566 / US | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZERFAS, Jeffrey W. 2700 McMillan Court Bloomington Indiana 47401 / US | 02 /
JORTBERG, Paul 10 Farrwood Road Windham NewHampshire 03087 / US | 03 /
TUMMINELLI, Richard P. 79 Prospect St. Ashland Massachusetts 01721 / US | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/04] | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2010/39] | Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08867830.5 | 22.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008US87948 | Priority number, date | US20070015720P | 21.12.2007 Original published format: US 15720 P | US20080340350 | 19.12.2008 Original published format: US 340350 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009086268 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2232315 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2232315 | Date: | 23.01.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/287, G02B6/42, A61B1/07, // A61B1/307 | [2012/30] | CPC: |
G02B6/4203 (EP,US);
G02B6/262 (US);
G02B23/2423 (US);
G02B23/26 (US);
G02B6/3813 (US);
G02B6/4296 (EP,US);
A61B18/24 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00477 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00494 (US);
A61B2018/00505 (US);
A61B2018/00982 (US);
A61B2018/2222 (US);
|
Former IPC [2010/39] | G02B6/287, G02B6/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG IN ZUSAMMENHANG MIT EINEM STARTANSCHLUSSTEIL EINER LASERENERGIEABGABEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN URETHROSKOP | [2010/39] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUS RELATED TO A LAUNCH CONNECTOR PORTION OF A URETEROSCOPE LASER-ENERGY-DELIVERY DEVICE | [2010/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL LIÉS À UNE PARTIE DE CONNECTEUR DE LANCEMENT D'UN DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION D'ÉNERGIE LASER D'URÉTOROSCOPE | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 27.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/01] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.11.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 08.11.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.11.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.12.2008 | AT | 23.01.2013 | BE | 23.01.2013 | CY | 23.01.2013 | CZ | 23.01.2013 | DK | 23.01.2013 | EE | 23.01.2013 | FI | 23.01.2013 | HR | 23.01.2013 | IT | 23.01.2013 | LT | 23.01.2013 | LV | 23.01.2013 | MC | 23.01.2013 | MT | 23.01.2013 | NL | 23.01.2013 | PL | 23.01.2013 | RO | 23.01.2013 | SE | 23.01.2013 | SI | 23.01.2013 | SK | 23.01.2013 | TR | 23.01.2013 | BG | 23.04.2013 | NO | 23.04.2013 | GR | 24.04.2013 | ES | 04.05.2013 | IS | 23.05.2013 | PT | 23.05.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 22.12.2008 | |
AT | 23.01.2013 | ||
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
TR | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
MC | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
IT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CY | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
RO | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
SK | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
DK | 23.01.2013 | ||
EE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/41] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
HR | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
PT | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
LV | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
FI | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
NL | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
SI | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
GR | 24.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 23.01.2013 | |
BE | 23.01.2013 | ||
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
PL | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
ES | 04.05.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 23.01.2013 | |
LT | 23.01.2013 | ||
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
SE | 23.01.2013 | ||
BG | 23.04.2013 | ||
NO | 23.04.2013 | ||
IS | 23.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 23.01.2013 | |
NO | 23.04.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5291570 (FILGAS DAVID M [US], et al) [A] 1-28* the whole document *; | [Y]US5745626 (DUCK GARY STEPHEN [CA], et al) [Y] 18,27 * abstract * * column 3, lines 61-67 *; | [Y]US6282349 (GRIFFIN STEPHEN [US]) [Y] 5,16,18,26,27 * abstract * * column 2, lines 44-57 * * column 4, lines 5-17 * * column 4, lines 29-34 *; | [XY]US2007122084 (STEPHEN GRIFFIN E [US]) [X] 1-4,6-15,17,19-25,28 * the whole document * [Y] 5,16,18,26,27 |