EP2139821 - NON-LEAD CRYSTAL GLASS WITH HIGH TRANSPARENCY AND HIGH BRIGHTNESS SUITABLE FOR MELTING IN A COLD-TOP ELECTRIC FURNACE WITH TIN OXIDE ELECTRODES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCR Cristalleria Italiana S.P.A. Loc. Catarelli Via Senese 53034 Colle Val D'Elsa, Siena / IT | [2010/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOSCHI, Giancarlo Via Raffaello Sanzio 8 Loc. Campiglia I-53034 Colle Val D'Elsa, Siena / IT | [2010/01] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing.A. Mannucci Via della Scala 4 50123 Firenze / IT | Application number, filing date | 08867960.0 | 22.12.2008 | [2010/01] | WO2008IT00779 | Priority number, date | IT2007FI00291 | 28.12.2007 Original published format: IT FI20070291 | [2010/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009084067 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2139821 | Date: | 06.01.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2139821 | Date: | 15.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C03C4/00 | [2010/01] | CPC: |
C03C4/0028 (EP);
C03B5/027 (EP);
C03C3/097 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/01] | Title | German: | BLEIFREIES KRISTALLGLAS MIT HOHER TRANSPARENZ UND HOHER HELLIGKEIT ZUR SCHMELZUNG IN EINEM ELEKTRISCHEN OFEN MIT KALTER SPITZE UND ZINNOXID-ELEKTRODEN | [2010/01] | English: | NON-LEAD CRYSTAL GLASS WITH HIGH TRANSPARENCY AND HIGH BRIGHTNESS SUITABLE FOR MELTING IN A COLD-TOP ELECTRIC FURNACE WITH TIN OXIDE ELECTRODES | [2010/01] | French: | CRISTAL SANS PLOMB AYANT UNE TRANSPARENCE ÉLEVÉE ET UNE BRILLANCE ÉLEVÉE APPROPRIÉ POUR LA FUSION DANS UN FOUR ÉLECTRIQUE À VOÛTE FROIDE ÉQUIPÉ D'ÉLECTRODES EN OXYDE D'ÉTAIN | [2010/01] | Entry into regional phase | 24.09.2009 | National basic fee paid | 24.09.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.09.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.09.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 20.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.06.2011 | BE | 15.06.2011 | CY | 15.06.2011 | CZ | 15.06.2011 | DK | 15.06.2011 | EE | 15.06.2011 | FI | 15.06.2011 | HR | 15.06.2011 | HU | 15.06.2011 | LT | 15.06.2011 | LV | 15.06.2011 | MT | 15.06.2011 | NL | 15.06.2011 | PL | 15.06.2011 | RO | 15.06.2011 | SE | 15.06.2011 | SI | 15.06.2011 | SK | 15.06.2011 | TR | 15.06.2011 | BG | 15.09.2011 | NO | 15.09.2011 | GR | 16.09.2011 | ES | 26.09.2011 | IS | 15.10.2011 | PT | 17.10.2011 | IE | 22.12.2011 | LU | 22.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | FR | 02.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
TR | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 22.12.2011 | ||
LU | 22.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
BG | 15.09.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 22.12.2011 | ||
LU | 22.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 22.12.2011 | ||
LU | 22.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
ES | 26.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 22.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/19] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 22.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
FR | 02.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
MT | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 22.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
IE | 22.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
DK | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/13] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 15.06.2011 | ||
EE | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
PL | 15.06.2011 | ||
RO | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
SK | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
IS | 15.10.2011 | ||
PT | 17.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
BE | 15.06.2011 | ||
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
NL | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 15.06.2011 | |
CY | 15.06.2011 | ||
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
LV | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
SI | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 15.06.2011 | |
FI | 15.06.2011 | ||
HR | 15.06.2011 | ||
LT | 15.06.2011 | ||
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
GR | 16.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 15.06.2011 | |
SE | 15.06.2011 | ||
NO | 15.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 15.06.2011 | |
NO | 15.09.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH09328330 ; | [A]US5897678 (KOMIYA HIDETOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 1, line 40 - column 3, line 50; claims 1-4 *; | [A]WO0009456 (CORNING INC [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 8 - page 5, line 25; claims 1-12 *; | [A]WO2004063108 (CBMM SA [BR], et al) [A] 1-11 * page 3, line 1 - page 4, line 6; claims 1,2 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1998, no. 10, Database accession no. 1998-105009, XP002521579 & JPH09328330 A 19971222 (TOYO GLASS CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * abstract * | by applicant | US5270269 | EP0575758 | US5376597 | EP0738243 | EP0893417 | US5897678 | WO0009456 | US6184166 | WO2004063108 |