EP2232466 - ELECTROLUMINESCENT DISPLAY HAVING COMPENSATED ANALOG SIGNAL FOR ACTIVATING THE DRIVING TRANSISTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.2016 [2016/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Global OLED Technology LLC 13873 Park Center Road, Suite 330 Herndon, VA 20171 / US | [2011/40] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states Global OLED Technology LLC 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEON, Felipe Antonio c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | 02 /
WHITE, Christopher Jason c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | 03 /
PARRETT, Gary c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | 04 /
PRIMERANO, Bruno c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Wibbelmann, Jobst, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08868801.5 | 11.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008US13573 | Priority number, date | US20070962182 | 21.12.2007 Original published format: US 962182 | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009085113 | Date: | 09.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2232466 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/32 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
G09G3/3291 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0417 (EP,US);
G09G2320/029 (EP,US);
G09G2320/043 (EP,US);
G09G2320/045 (EP,US);
G09G3/3233 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | ELEKTROLUMINESZENZANZEIGE MIT KOMPENSIERTEM ANALOGSIGNAL ZUR AKTIVIERUNG DES TREIBERTRANSISTORS | [2010/39] | English: | ELECTROLUMINESCENT DISPLAY HAVING COMPENSATED ANALOG SIGNAL FOR ACTIVATING THE DRIVING TRANSISTOR | [2010/39] | French: | SIGNAL ANALOGIQUE COMPENSÉ D'ATTAQUE DE TRANSISTOR POUR DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 09.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2012 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 25.07.2012 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 01.06.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/11] | 09.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.06.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005071649 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,9,11-13,16,17,21-24 * page 1; figures 1,2 ** page 8, line 22 - page 13, line 29 * |