EP2243217 - MULTI-LINEARITY MODE LNA HAVING A DEBOOST CURRENT PATH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated Attn: International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2010/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Li-chung 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121-1714 / US | [2010/43] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/43] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08869334.6 | 27.12.2008 | [2010/43] | WO2008US88382 | Priority number, date | US20080969375 | 04.01.2008 Original published format: US 969375 | [2010/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2009088813 | Date: | 16.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2243217 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H03F1/32, H03F1/22, H03F3/72 | [2017/14] | CPC: |
H03F1/3205 (EP,US);
H03F1/223 (EP,US);
H03F1/3252 (EP,US);
H03F3/72 (EP,US);
H03F2200/492 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/43] | H03F1/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/43] | Title | German: | MULTILINEARITÄTSMODUS-LNA MIT DEBOOST-STROMWEG | [2010/43] | English: | MULTI-LINEARITY MODE LNA HAVING A DEBOOST CURRENT PATH | [2010/43] | French: | AMPLIFICATEUR À FAIBLE BRUIT À MODE MULTILINÉAIRE AYANT UN CIRCUIT DE COURANT D'ÉQUILIBRAGE | [2010/43] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/43] | 28.09.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 15.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/06] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.03.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006091962 (KIM TAE W [KR], et al) [X] 1-6,16,17 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0022]; figure 2 *; | [AD]US2005176399 (APARIN VLADIMIR [US]) [AD] 1-6,16,17 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0025]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2004145415 (SUN BO [US]) [A] 7-15,18-21 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036]; figure 4 * | [A] - YANDURU N K ET AL, "A WCDMA, GSM/GPRS/EDGE Receiver Front End without Interstage SAW Filter", RADIO FREQUENCY INTEGRATED CIRCUITS (RFIC) SYMPOSIUM, 2006 IEEE, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20060611), ISBN 978-0-7803-9572-5, pages 9 - 12, XP010925083 [A] 1-6,16,17 * "Section IV. LNA Design";;; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RFIC.2006.1651078 | [A] - APARIN V ET AL, "Modified derivative superposition method for linearizing FET low noise amplifiers", RADIO FREQUENCY INTEGRATED CIRCUITS (RFIC) SYMPOSIUM, 2004. DIGEST OF PAPERS. 2004 IEEE FORT WORTH, TX, USA JUNE 6-8, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040606), ISBN 978-0-7803-8333-3, pages 105 - 108, XP010714259 [A] 1-6,16,17 * Section "Modified DS Method and LNA Design";;; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/RFIC.2004.1320540 |