EP2218698 - LAMINATED GLASS WITH INSERTED PLASTIC FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Central Glass Company, Limited 5253 Oaza Okiube Ube-shi Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP | [2010/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YONEKURA, Masaaki c/o Glass Research Center of Central Glass Company, Ltd. 1510, Oguchi-cho, Matsusaka-shi Mie 515-0001 / JP | 02 /
NAKAMURA, Isao c/o Matsuzaka Plant of Central Glass Company, Ltd. 1521-2, Oguchi-cho, Matsusaka-shi Mie 515-0001 / JP | 03 /
IZUTANI, Kensuke c/o Glass Research Center of Central Glass Company, Ltd. 1510, Oguchi-cho, Matsusaka-shi Mie 515-0001 / JP | 04 /
TAKAMATSU, Atsushi c/o Glass Research Center of Central Glass Company, Ltd. 1510, Oguchi-cho, Matsusaka-shi Mie 515-0001 / JP | [2012/25] |
Former [2010/33] | 01 /
YONEKURA, Masaaki c/o Glass Research Center of Central Glass Company, Ltd., 1510, Oguchi-cho, Matsusaka-shi Mie 515-0001 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKUMARA, Isao c/o Matsuzaka Plant of Central Glass Company, Ltd., 1521-2, Oguchi-cho, Matsusaka-shi Mie 515-0001 / JP | |||
03 /
IZUTANI, Kensuke c/o Glass Research Center of Central Glass Company, Ltd., 1510, Oguchi-cho, Matsusaka-shi Mie 515-0001 / JP | |||
04 /
TAKAMATSU, Atsushi c/o Glass Research Center of Central Glass Company, Ltd., 1510, Oguchi-cho, Matsusaka-shi Mie 515-0001 / JP | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/32] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/33] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Martin-Greif-Strasse 1 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08869432.8 | 16.12.2008 | [2010/33] | WO2008JP72860 | Priority number, date | JP20080002189 | 09.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008002189 | [2010/33] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009087869 | Date: | 16.07.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2218698 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2218698 | Date: | 08.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C03C27/12, B32B17/10, B60J1/00 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
B32B17/10174 (EP,KR,US);
C03C27/10 (KR);
B32B17/10 (KR);
B32B17/10036 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10293 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10348 (EP,KR);
B32B17/10761 (EP,KR,US);
B32B17/10788 (EP,KR,US);
B60J1/00 (KR);
| C-Set: |
B32B17/10005, B32B2367/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/33] | Title | German: | VERBUNDGLAS MIT EINGESETZTEM KUNSTSTOFFFILM | [2010/33] | English: | LAMINATED GLASS WITH INSERTED PLASTIC FILM | [2010/33] | French: | VERRE STRATIFIÉ POURVU D'UN FILM DE PLASTIQUE INSÉRÉ | [2010/33] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2010 | Translation filed | 06.05.2010 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2010 | Search fee paid | 06.05.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 17.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 10.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2008 | AT | 08.08.2012 | BE | 08.08.2012 | CY | 08.08.2012 | CZ | 08.08.2012 | DK | 08.08.2012 | EE | 08.08.2012 | FI | 08.08.2012 | HR | 08.08.2012 | IT | 08.08.2012 | LT | 08.08.2012 | LV | 08.08.2012 | MT | 08.08.2012 | NL | 08.08.2012 | PL | 08.08.2012 | RO | 08.08.2012 | SE | 08.08.2012 | SI | 08.08.2012 | SK | 08.08.2012 | TR | 08.08.2012 | BG | 08.11.2012 | NO | 08.11.2012 | GR | 09.11.2012 | ES | 19.11.2012 | IS | 08.12.2012 | PT | 10.12.2012 | IE | 16.12.2012 | LU | 16.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
IE | 16.12.2012 | ||
LU | 16.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
TR | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
IE | 16.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
MT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
IE | 16.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
IE | 16.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
IE | 16.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
BG | 08.11.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
IT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
RO | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
SK | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
EE | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
ES | 19.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
DK | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
NL | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
PT | 10.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
BE | 08.08.2012 | ||
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SE | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
LV | 08.08.2012 | ||
PL | 08.08.2012 | ||
SI | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
GR | 09.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
CY | 08.08.2012 | ||
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
HR | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
IS | 08.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
FI | 08.08.2012 | ||
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 08.08.2012 | |
LT | 08.08.2012 | ||
NO | 08.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 08.08.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002094407 (FROST THORSTEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,6 * paragraphs [0001] - [0099]; figures 1-5; claims 1-21 *[I] 7 | International search | [A]JPS60225747 (TEIJIN LTD); | [Y]JPH0634983 (SHARP KK); | [X]JP2000247691 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE) | by applicant | JPS5632352 | JPH0618856 |