EP2230658 - DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.05.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIKAWA, Yohsuke Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha, 22-22, Nagaike-cho, Abeno-Ku, Osaka-shi Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2010/38] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/38] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08869475.7 | 10.09.2008 | [2010/38] | WO2008JP02504 | Priority number, date | JP20080001820 | 09.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008001820 | [2010/38] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009087706 | Date: | 16.07.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2230658 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/13, G02F1/1339 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
G02F1/1339 (EP,US);
G02F1/1309 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/38] | G09F9/30, G02F1/1339, G02F1/1345, G09F9/00, H01L29/786 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/38] | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG | [2010/38] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE | [2010/38] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE | [2010/38] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2010 | Translation filed | 22.04.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2010 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.04.2010 | Examination requested [2010/38] | 03.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/26] | 06.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0895220 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1,4-6 * paragraphs [0087] - [0089] - [0125]; figures 4,19 * [I] 7,9; | [XI]US2007182442 (HATA YUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,8 * paragraph [0059]; figure 1 * [I] 7,9; | [XI]US2002140650 (KAI TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0125] , [0127]; figure 24 * [I] 7; | [XDI]JPH11133461 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [XD] 1-3 * abstract * [I] 7 | International search | [Y]JPH11133461 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JP2005004164 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB, et al); | [Y]JPH06289413 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]WO0007170 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2004199082 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JP2004200034 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JP2004029834 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]JP2005352419 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2002124554 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH11109400 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) | by applicant | JP2005352419 | JP2002124554 | JPS6115570B | JP2004341216 | JPH11133461 |