EP2228970 - METHOD,SYSTEM AND RELATED DEVICE FOR PROCESSING CIRCUIT SWITCHED DOMAIN SERVICE IN EVOLVED PACKET NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2016 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): GR | published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2010/37] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
Former [2010/37] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Yijun Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property department B1-3A, Bantian,Longgang District 518129, Shenzhen / CN | [2013/27] |
Former [2010/37] | 01 /
YU, Yijun c/o Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Intellectual Property department B1-3A, Bantian Longgang District 518129 Shenzhen / CN | Representative(s) | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstraße 25 80992 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Dessauerstrasse 3 80992 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/34] | Körber, Martin Hans, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstraße 33 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/21] | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Dessauerstrasse 3 80992 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/37] | Kreuz, Georg Maria, et al Huawei Technologies Riesstrasse 25 80992 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08870552.0 | 26.11.2008 | [2010/37] | WO2008CN73200 | Priority number, date | CN20081002762 | 16.01.2008 Original published format: CN200810002762 | [2010/37] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009089704 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | ZH | [2009/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2228970 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2228970 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 23.07.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04W68/02 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
H04W68/02 (EP,US);
H04W24/02 (US);
H04W36/0022 (EP,US);
H04W76/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/22] | H04L29/06, H04W76/02 | ||
Former IPC [2010/37] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND ENTSPRECHENDE VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERARBEITUNG EINES LEITUNGSVERMITTELTEN DOMÄNENDIENSTES IN EINEM ENTWICKELTEN PAKETNETZWERK | [2010/37] | English: | METHOD,SYSTEM AND RELATED DEVICE FOR PROCESSING CIRCUIT SWITCHED DOMAIN SERVICE IN EVOLVED PACKET NETWORK | [2010/37] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, SYSTÈME ET DISPOSITIF ASSOCIÉ POUR TRAITER UN SERVICE DU DOMAINE À COMMUTATION DE CIRCUITS DANS UN RÉSEAU PAR PAQUETS ÉVOLUÉ | [2010/37] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2010 | Translation filed | 13.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2010 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/37] | 09.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP13186563.6 / EP2683133 | EP13186564.4 / EP2683134 | EP16205680.8 / EP3176992 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.11.2008 | BE | 23.10.2013 | BG | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | CZ | 23.10.2013 | DK | 23.10.2013 | EE | 23.10.2013 | FI | 23.10.2013 | HR | 23.10.2013 | LT | 23.10.2013 | LV | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | MT | 23.10.2013 | PL | 23.10.2013 | RO | 23.10.2013 | SE | 23.10.2013 | SI | 23.10.2013 | SK | 23.10.2013 | TR | 23.10.2013 | IE | 26.11.2013 | LU | 26.11.2013 | CH | 30.11.2013 | LI | 30.11.2013 | NO | 23.01.2014 | GR | 24.01.2014 | IS | 23.02.2014 | PT | 24.02.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.11.2013 | ||
LU | 26.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HU | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.11.2013 | ||
LU | 26.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 26.11.2008 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.11.2013 | ||
LU | 26.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
TR | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 26.11.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 30.11.2013 | ||
LI | 30.11.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
HR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
NO | 23.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 23.10.2013 | |
NO | 23.01.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1081971 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]); | [A]US2003026245 (EJZAK RICHARD PAUL [US]); | [E]WO2009000315 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | International search | [X]WO2006077555 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [Y]CN101039507 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]WO2007137615 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al); | [A]CN101090567 (ZHONGXING COMM CO LTD [CN]) |