EP2232841 - DSL METHOD HAVING VARIABLE UPLOAD/DOWNLOAD BIT RATE AND APPLICATION-SPECIFIC DYNAMIC PROFILE SWITCHING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2010/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KELLER, Walter Dümpelstrasse 15 40880 Ratingen / DE | [2010/39] | Representative(s) | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wißgott Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2017/40] |
Former [2010/39] | COHAUSZ DAWIDOWICZ HANNIG & SOZIEN Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08870564.5 | 11.11.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008EP09488 | Priority number, date | DE20081005290 | 19.01.2008 Original published format: DE102008005290 | [2010/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009089859 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2232841 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2232841 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04M11/06, H04L5/00, H04L5/14 | [2017/18] | CPC: |
H04M11/062 (EP,US);
H04L5/0042 (EP,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,US);
H04L5/14 (EP,US);
H04L5/143 (EP,US);
H04L5/1446 (EP,US);
Y02D30/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/39] | H04M11/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/40] |
Former [2010/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DSL-VERFAHREN MIT VARIABLER UPLOAD-/DOWNLOADBITRATE UND APPLIKATIONSSPEZIFISCHER, DYNAMISCHER PROFILUMSCHALTUNG | [2010/39] | English: | DSL METHOD HAVING VARIABLE UPLOAD/DOWNLOAD BIT RATE AND APPLICATION-SPECIFIC DYNAMIC PROFILE SWITCHING | [2010/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DSL À DÉBIT BINAIRE DE TÉLÉCHARGEMENT AMONT/AVAL VARIABLE, ET COMMUTATION DE PROFIL DYNAMIQUE, SPÉCIFIQUE À L'APPLICATION | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 11.10.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.11.2008 | CY | 04.10.2017 | CZ | 04.10.2017 | DK | 04.10.2017 | EE | 04.10.2017 | ES | 04.10.2017 | FI | 04.10.2017 | HR | 04.10.2017 | IT | 04.10.2017 | LT | 04.10.2017 | LV | 04.10.2017 | MC | 04.10.2017 | MT | 04.10.2017 | NL | 04.10.2017 | PL | 04.10.2017 | PT | 04.10.2017 | RO | 04.10.2017 | SE | 04.10.2017 | SI | 04.10.2017 | SK | 04.10.2017 | TR | 04.10.2017 | AT | 11.11.2017 | IE | 11.11.2017 | LU | 11.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | BG | 04.01.2018 | NO | 04.01.2018 | GR | 05.01.2018 | IS | 04.02.2018 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 11.11.2008 | |
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
AT | 11.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.11.2017 | ||
LU | 11.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 11.11.2008 | |
CY | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
AT | 11.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.11.2017 | ||
LU | 11.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 11.11.2008 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
AT | 11.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.11.2017 | ||
LU | 11.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
AT | 11.11.2017 | ||
IE | 11.11.2017 | ||
LU | 11.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.11.2017 | ||
LU | 11.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.11.2017 | ||
LU | 11.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
IE | 11.11.2017 | ||
LU | 11.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
MT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
LU | 11.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CZ | 04.10.2017 | |
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
LV | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
HR | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IS | 04.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/21] | FI | 04.10.2017 | |
LT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
NO | 04.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 04.10.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9965218 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * page 6, lines 5-38 * * page 7, line 1 - line 18 * * page 8, line 7 - line 36 * * page 9, line 9 - line 13 *; | [XA]US6167095 (FURUKAWA NEIL E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10 * abstract * * column 3, line 52 - column 6, line 18 * [A] 5-8,11-16; | [XA]WO0039977 (BROADCOM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * page 11, line 3 - line 32 * [A] 2,4-16 |