EP2231766 - ELASTOMERIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING HYDROCARBON POLYMER ADDITIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | For all designated states ExxonMobil Chemical Patents Inc. 5200 Bayway Drive Baytown, TX 77520-2101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RODGERS, Michael, Brendan 2119 Water Way Seabrook TX 77586-2964 / US | 02 /
DIAS, Anthony, Jay 918 Noble Springs Road Houston TX 77062 / US | 03 /
DAVIS, Rick, Dowell 11161 Innsbrook Court Ijamsville, Maryland 21754 / US | 04 /
BARBEE, Thomas, Read 2819 Evergreen Cliff Trail Kingwood TX 77345 / US | 05 /
MOWRY, Shawn, William 13502 Parkers Cove Court Houston, TX 77044 / US | [2011/04] |
Former [2010/45] | 01 /
RODGERS, Michael, Brendan 2119 Water Way Seabrook TX 77586-2964 / US | ||
02 /
DIAS, Anthony, Jay 918 Noble Springs Road Houston TX 77062 / US | |||
03 /
DAVIS, Rick, Dowell 11161 Innsbrook Court Ijamsville, Maryland 21754 / US | |||
04 /
BARBEE, Thomas, Read 2819 Evergreen Cliff Trail Kingwood TX 77345 / US | |||
05 /
MOWRY, Shawn, William 4219 West Baker, 409 Baytown, TX 77521 / US | |||
Former [2010/39] | 01 /
RODGERS, Michael, Brendan 2119 Water Way Seabrook TX 77586-2964 / US | ||
02 /
DIAS, Anthony, Jay 918 Noble Springs Road Houston TX 77062 / US | |||
03 /
DAVIS, Rick, Dowell 11161 Innsbrook Court Ijamsville, Maryland 21754 / US | |||
04 /
BARBEE, Thomas, Read 2819 Evergreen Cliff Trail Kingwood TX 77345 / US | |||
05 /
MOWRY, Shawn, William 4219 W. Baker Road 409 Baytown TX 77521 / US | Representative(s) | Pols, Ronald Maarten ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Pols, Ronald Maarten ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Shared Services P.O. Box 105 Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | ||
Former [2010/39] | Pols, Ronald Maarten ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Shared Services P.O. Box 105 Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 08870637.9 | 29.12.2008 | [2010/39] | WO2008US88445 | Priority number, date | US20080022122P | 18.01.2008 Original published format: US 22122 P | [2010/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009091490 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2231766 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2231766 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08L21/00, C08L9/06, C08K5/01, // C08K5/00, C08K3/00, C08L23/22, C08L23/28 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
C08L21/00 (EP,US);
B60C1/0016 (EP,US);
C08K5/01 (EP,US);
C08L7/00 (EP,US);
C08L9/00 (EP,US);
C08L9/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/01, C08L21/00 (EP,US);
C08L21/00, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L21/00, C08L2666/06 (EP,US);
C08L7/00, C08L2666/06 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2010/39] | C08L7/00, C08L9/00, C08L21/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/39] | Title | German: | ELASTOMERZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT KOHLENWASSERSTOFFPOLYMERZUSÄTZEN | [2010/39] | English: | ELASTOMERIC COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING HYDROCARBON POLYMER ADDITIVES | [2010/39] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ÉLASTOMÈRES COMPRENANT DES ADDITIFS POLYMÈRES HYDROCARBURES | [2010/39] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/39] | 12.03.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 16.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.12.2008 | AT | 15.08.2012 | BE | 15.08.2012 | CY | 15.08.2012 | CZ | 15.08.2012 | DK | 15.08.2012 | EE | 15.08.2012 | FI | 15.08.2012 | HR | 15.08.2012 | IT | 15.08.2012 | LT | 15.08.2012 | LV | 15.08.2012 | MT | 15.08.2012 | NL | 15.08.2012 | PL | 15.08.2012 | RO | 15.08.2012 | SE | 15.08.2012 | SI | 15.08.2012 | SK | 15.08.2012 | TR | 15.08.2012 | BG | 15.11.2012 | NO | 15.11.2012 | GR | 16.11.2012 | ES | 26.11.2012 | IS | 15.12.2012 | PT | 17.12.2012 | IE | 29.12.2012 | LU | 29.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
IE | 29.12.2012 | ||
LU | 29.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
TR | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
IE | 29.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CY | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
IE | 29.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
MT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
IE | 29.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
IE | 29.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
IE | 29.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
BG | 15.11.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
IT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
RO | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
SK | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
EE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
ES | 26.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
DK | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
NL | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
PT | 17.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
BE | 15.08.2012 | ||
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SE | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
LV | 15.08.2012 | ||
PL | 15.08.2012 | ||
SI | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
GR | 16.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
HR | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
IS | 15.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
FI | 15.08.2012 | ||
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 15.08.2012 | |
LT | 15.08.2012 | ||
NO | 15.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.08.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9857999 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US6214919 (SCHLADEMAN JAMES ANDERSON [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004009700 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]US2007149689 (WANG XIAORONG [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2007078369 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document * |