EP2219998 - CRYSTALLISED SOLID IM-18 AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4, Avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/40] | For all designated states IFP Energies nouvelles 1 & 4, avenue de Bois-Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2010/34] | For all designated states IFP 1-4 Avenue de Bois Préau 92852 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LORGOUILLOUX, Yannick 14 rue Lesage F-87100 Limoges / FR | 02 /
PAILLAUD, Jean-Louis 58 rue du Docteur Mangeney F-68100 Mulhouse / FR | 03 /
CAULLET, Philippe 4 rue Kellermann F-68110 Illzach / FR | 04 /
PATARIN, Joël 10 rue des Merles F-68720 Flaxlanden / FR | 05 /
BATS, Nicolas 6 impasse Giuseppe Verdi F-69320 Feyzin / FR | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/41] | Application number, filing date | 08870944.9 | 17.10.2008 | [2010/34] | WO2008FR01458 | Priority number, date | FR20070007928 | 12.11.2007 Original published format: FR 0707928 | [2010/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009090337 | Date: | 23.07.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2219998 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.07.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2219998 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C01B37/00, C01B37/02, C01B39/06, B01J20/10, B01J20/06 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
C01B37/005 (EP,US);
B01J20/18 (EP,US);
C01B37/02 (EP,US);
C01B39/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | KRISTALLISIERTER IM-18-FESTKÖRPER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2010/34] | English: | CRYSTALLISED SOLID IM-18 AND METHOD FOR PREPARING SAME | [2010/34] | French: | SOLIDE CRISTALLISE IM-18 ET SON PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [2010/34] | Entry into regional phase | 14.06.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.06.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.06.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.06.2010 | Examination requested [2010/34] | 06.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.10.2011 | CY | 12.10.2011 | CZ | 12.10.2011 | EE | 12.10.2011 | FI | 12.10.2011 | HR | 12.10.2011 | HU | 12.10.2011 | IE | 12.10.2011 | IT | 12.10.2011 | LT | 12.10.2011 | LV | 12.10.2011 | MT | 12.10.2011 | PL | 12.10.2011 | RO | 12.10.2011 | SE | 12.10.2011 | SI | 12.10.2011 | SK | 12.10.2011 | TR | 12.10.2011 | LU | 17.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | BG | 12.01.2012 | NO | 12.01.2012 | GR | 13.01.2012 | IS | 12.02.2012 | PT | 13.02.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
TR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LU | 17.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
FI | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
LU | 17.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
LU | 17.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
MT | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 12.10.2011 | |
CY | 12.10.2011 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
IT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
PL | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
RO | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
SK | 12.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
IE | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
CZ | 12.10.2011 | ||
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
HR | 12.10.2011 | ||
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/27] | HR | 12.10.2011 | |
LT | 12.10.2011 | ||
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 12.10.2011 | |
LV | 12.10.2011 | ||
SE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 12.10.2011 | |
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 12.10.2011 | |
NO | 12.01.2012 | ||
IS | 12.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 12.10.2011 | |
NO | 12.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP1510501 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [X] 5,6,8,9 * claims 7-11 * * examples 1-3 * [A] 1; | [XA]EP1518827 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE [FR]) [X] 5,6,8 * claims 5,6,8 * * examples 1,2 * [A] 1; | [A]US2005090389 (ZONES STACEY I [US], et al); | [A]WO2006037436 (EXXONMOBIL CHEM PATENTS INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US3130007 | US3702886 | US4073865 | US4954325 | US5178748 | US5420279 | US6043179 | US6471939 | US6471941 | WO02092511 | - CORMA, A. ET AL., NATURE MATERIALS, (2003), vol. 2, page 493 | - BURTON, A. ET AL., CHEMISTRY : A EUR. JOURNAL, (2003), vol. 9, page 5737 | - BURTON, A. ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2003), vol. 125, page 1633 | - BLACKWELL, C.S. ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM., INT. ED., (2003), vol. 42, page 1737 | - PROC. INT. ZEOL. CONF., (1986), page 121 | - J.M. CHéZEAU ET AL., ZEOLITES, (1991), vol. 11, page 598 | - A. CORMA ET AL., CHEM. COMMUN., (2001), vol. 16, page 1486 | - CHEM. COMMUN., (2003), vol. 9, page 1050 | - JL.PAILLAUD ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 304, page 990 |