31.10.2014 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
29.07.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.01.2014 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
15.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.07.2012 |
New entry: Decision on request for further processing |
|
23.07.2012 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
23.07.2012 |
New entry: Fee payment for request for further processing |
|
20.07.2012 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.05.2012 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
02.02.2012 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
10.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.09.2011 |
First examination report |
|
22.09.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.04.2011 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] |
21.01.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
21.01.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
12.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2011 |
Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.09.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2010 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
20.08.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.08.2010 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.08.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.08.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|