EP2248349 - PIEZO SPEAKER PRESSURE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Mobile Communications AB 221 88 Lund / SE | [2015/49] |
Former [2010/45] | For all designated states Sony Ericsson Mobile Communications AB Nya Vattentornet 221 88 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EATON, Willam Chris 204 Wentbridge Road Cary North Carolina 27519 / US | [2010/45] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/16] |
Former [2010/45] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/45] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 DE-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08872428.1 | 11.09.2008 | [2010/45] | WO2008US75943 | Priority number, date | US20080030535 | 13.02.2008 Original published format: US 30535 | [2010/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009102344 | Date: | 20.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2248349 | Date: | 10.11.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.08.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2248349 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04R17/00, H04R1/42, H04M1/03 | [2010/45] | CPC: |
H04R17/00 (EP,US);
H04R1/42 (EP,US);
H04R2499/11 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/16] |
Former [2010/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | DRUCKSENSOR FÜR PIEZOLAUTSPRECHER | [2010/45] | English: | PIEZO SPEAKER PRESSURE SENSOR | [2010/45] | French: | CAPTEUR DE PRESSION DE HAUT-PARLEUR PIÉZO-ÉLECTRIQUE | [2010/45] | Entry into regional phase | 27.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2009 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/45] | 08.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2014 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.10.2014 | 28.10.2014 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.09.2008 | AT | 15.04.2015 | BE | 15.04.2015 | BG | 15.04.2015 | CY | 15.04.2015 | CZ | 15.04.2015 | DK | 15.04.2015 | EE | 15.04.2015 | ES | 15.04.2015 | FI | 15.04.2015 | HR | 15.04.2015 | IT | 15.04.2015 | LT | 15.04.2015 | LV | 15.04.2015 | MC | 15.04.2015 | MT | 15.04.2015 | NL | 15.04.2015 | PL | 15.04.2015 | RO | 15.04.2015 | SE | 15.04.2015 | SI | 15.04.2015 | SK | 15.04.2015 | TR | 15.04.2015 | NO | 15.07.2015 | GR | 16.07.2015 | IS | 15.08.2015 | PT | 17.08.2015 | FR | 30.09.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/21] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
MT | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
BE | 15.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
FR | 30.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SI | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
MC | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
IT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
CZ | 15.04.2015 | ||
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
PL | 15.04.2015 | ||
RO | 15.04.2015 | ||
SK | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
EE | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
DK | 15.04.2015 | ||
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 15.04.2015 | |
ES | 15.04.2015 | ||
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.08.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 15.04.2015 | |
FI | 15.04.2015 | ||
HR | 15.04.2015 | ||
LT | 15.04.2015 | ||
LV | 15.04.2015 | ||
NL | 15.04.2015 | ||
NO | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.07.2015 | ||
PT | 17.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 15.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]KR20030090272 (POINCHIPS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 7-18 * abstract * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE202007002778U (HOOK CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [X] 1-18 * the whole document * * figure 2 * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * claims 10-12 *; | [X]US2006288793 (TANAKA HIROAKI [JP]) [X] 1-18 * the whole document * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0049] *; | [A]EP1492314 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0021] * |