EP2246655 - HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UENO, Madoka C/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [2010/44] | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/44] | Treeby, Philip David William R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 08872595.7 | 08.09.2008 | [2010/44] | WO2008JP66165 | Priority number, date | JP20080036932 | 19.02.2008 Original published format: JP 2008036932 | [2010/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009104295 | Date: | 27.08.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2246655 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.08.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/02, F25B39/02, F28D1/053, F28F9/22, F28D1/02 | [2017/27] | CPC: |
F28D1/05375 (EP);
F28F9/0246 (EP);
F28D2001/028 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2010/44] | F28F9/02, F25B39/02, F28D1/053, F28F9/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/44] | Title | German: | WÄRMETAUSCHER | [2010/44] | English: | HEAT EXCHANGER | [2010/44] | French: | ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR | [2010/44] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2010 | Translation filed | 12.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/44] | 28.11.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/10] | 18.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2018 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US5095972 (NAKAGURO KAZUHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 58 - column 5, line 29; figure 1 * [A] 3 [I] 4,5; | [XAI]EP0855567 (MODINE MFG CO [US]) [X] 1,2 * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 16; figure 11 * [A] 3 [I] 4,5; | [XAI]JPH0379994 (NIPPON DENSO CO) [X] 1,2 * figure 5 * [A] 3 [I] 4,5; | [XAI]JPH06273088 (ZEXEL CORP) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,5,8 * [A] 3 [I] 4,5 | International search | [Y]JPH0614782U (NIPPON LIGHT METAL CO., LTD.); | [Y]JPH06273088 (ZEXEL CORP); | [Y]JPH0379994 (NIPPON DENSO CO); | [A]JP2006138559 (CALSONIC KANSEI CORP); | [A]JP2004077032 (ZEXEL VALEO CLIMATE CONTR CORP); | [A]US4484622 (SATCHWELL DAVID L [US]); | [A]JPS6314093 (NIPPON DENSO CO) | by applicant | JP3133897B | JPH0614782U |