EP2265017 - TUNING DEVICE MOUNTED ON CAR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, MT, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2015/43] |
Former [2010/51] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASAURA, Tsuyoshi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
OKUBO, Tadatoshi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
SAKATA, Kenji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2015/43] |
Former [2010/51] | 01 /
KASAURA, Tsuyoshi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | ||
02 /
OKUBO, Tadatoshi c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | |||
03 /
SAKATA, Kenji c/o Mitsubishi Electric Corporation 7-3 Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/43] |
Former [2010/51] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08873957.8 | 04.12.2008 | [2010/51] | WO2008JP03583 | Priority number, date | JP20080105590 | 15.04.2008 Original published format: JP 2008105590 | [2010/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009128121 | Date: | 22.10.2009 | Language: | JA | [2009/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2265017 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2265017 | Date: | 21.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.10.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/173, H04B1/16, H04H60/46, H04H60/72, H04N5/44, H04H20/10, H04H20/26 | [2012/04] | CPC: |
H04H60/72 (EP);
H03J1/0075 (EP);
H04H20/106 (EP);
H04H20/26 (EP);
H04H40/09 (EP);
H04N21/41422 (EP);
H04N21/4331 (EP);
H04N21/4333 (EP);
H04N21/4345 (EP);
H04N21/4383 (EP);
H04N21/4532 (EP);
H04N5/50 (EP);
H04N5/782 (EP);
H03J2200/20 (EP);
H04H60/27 (EP);
H04H60/46 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/51] | H04N7/173, H04B1/16, H04H60/46, H04H60/72, H04N5/44 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/43] |
Former [2010/51] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AM AUTO ANGEBRACHTE ABSTIMMUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2010/51] | English: | TUNING DEVICE MOUNTED ON CAR | [2010/51] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SYNTONISATION MONTÉ SUR VÉHICULE | [2010/51] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2010 | Translation filed | 18.08.2010 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2010 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/51] | 11.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 19.05.2015 | 19.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 04.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2008 | AT | 21.10.2015 | BE | 21.10.2015 | BG | 21.10.2015 | CY | 21.10.2015 | CZ | 21.10.2015 | DK | 21.10.2015 | EE | 21.10.2015 | ES | 21.10.2015 | FI | 21.10.2015 | HR | 21.10.2015 | IT | 21.10.2015 | LT | 21.10.2015 | LV | 21.10.2015 | MC | 21.10.2015 | MT | 21.10.2015 | NL | 21.10.2015 | PL | 21.10.2015 | RO | 21.10.2015 | SE | 21.10.2015 | SI | 21.10.2015 | SK | 21.10.2015 | TR | 21.10.2015 | IE | 04.12.2015 | LU | 04.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | FR | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | GB | 21.01.2016 | NO | 21.01.2016 | GR | 22.01.2016 | IS | 21.02.2016 | PT | 22.02.2016 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
BE | 21.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 04.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 21.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 04.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
FR | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 21.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SI | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 04.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 21.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 04.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
GB | 21.01.2016 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 04.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
IE | 04.12.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
DK | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
EE | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
RO | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
SK | 21.10.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
CZ | 21.10.2015 | ||
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
LU | 04.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
MC | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LV | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 21.10.2015 | |
ES | 21.10.2015 | ||
FI | 21.10.2015 | ||
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
PL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
GR | 22.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
PT | 22.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
HR | 21.10.2015 | ||
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
SE | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NL | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
IS | 21.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
IT | 21.10.2015 | ||
LT | 21.10.2015 | ||
NO | 21.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 21.10.2015 | |
LT | 21.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0040012 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [I] 1-6 * figures 1, 4 * * page 1, line 2 - page 1, line 10 * * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 8 * * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 11 * * page 6, line 1 - page 6, line 12 * * page 7, line 29 - page 7, line 32 * * page 4, line 18 - page 4, line 29 * * page 8, line 1 - page 8, line 30 * | International search | [X]JP2001169194 (FUJITSU TEN LTD); | [Y]JP2006246158 (SHARP KK); | [Y]JP2003189218 (FUJITSU LTD); | [Y]JP2000115098 (VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN); | [A]JP2008022353 (HCX KK, et al); | [A]JP2006157836 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC); | [A]JP2007189727 (KYOCERA CORP); | [A]JP2005109982 (CANON KK) | Examination | US2006174269 | by applicant | JP2005217588 | JP2004312627 |