EP2269246 - ENERGY STORAGE MODULE AND POWER TOOL COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE ENERGY STORAGE MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2011/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOEGE, Volker Am Kellerberg 7 89561 Dischingen / DE | 02 /
LIEBENOW, Cornelius Johann-Sebastian-Bach-Strasse 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | 03 /
GLAUNING, Rainer Froschegert 11 72631 Aichtal-Groetzingen / DE | [2011/01] | Application number, filing date | 08874041.0 | 04.12.2008 | [2011/01] | WO2008EP66790 | Priority number, date | DE20081001286 | 21.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008001286 | [2011/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009129872 | Date: | 29.10.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2269246 | Date: | 05.01.2011 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.10.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2269246 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/02, H01M2/10, H01M10/052 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
H01M50/121 (EP,US);
H01M50/143 (EP,US);
H01M50/136 (EP,US);
H01M50/211 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2011/01] | H01M2/02, H01M2/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/01] | Title | German: | ENERGIESPEICHERMODUL SOWIE ELEKTROWERKZEUG MIT MINDESTENS EINEM ENERGIESPEICHERMODUL | [2011/01] | English: | ENERGY STORAGE MODULE AND POWER TOOL COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE ENERGY STORAGE MODULE | [2011/01] | French: | MODULE ACCUMULATEUR D'ÉNERGIE ET OUTIL ÉLECTRIQUE ÉQUIPÉ D'AU MOINS UN MODULE ACCUMULATEUR D'ÉNERGIE | [2011/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.11.2010 | National basic fee paid | 22.11.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.11.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2010 | Examination requested [2011/01] | 12.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.05.2012 | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2008 | BG | 07.08.2013 | CY | 07.08.2013 | CZ | 07.08.2013 | DK | 07.08.2013 | EE | 07.08.2013 | ES | 07.08.2013 | FI | 07.08.2013 | HR | 07.08.2013 | IT | 07.08.2013 | LT | 07.08.2013 | LV | 07.08.2013 | MC | 07.08.2013 | MT | 07.08.2013 | NL | 07.08.2013 | PL | 07.08.2013 | RO | 07.08.2013 | SE | 07.08.2013 | SI | 07.08.2013 | SK | 07.08.2013 | TR | 07.08.2013 | NO | 07.11.2013 | GR | 08.11.2013 | AT | 04.12.2013 | GB | 04.12.2013 | IE | 04.12.2013 | LU | 04.12.2013 | IS | 07.12.2013 | PT | 09.12.2013 | BE | 31.12.2013 | CH | 31.12.2013 | LI | 31.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 04.12.2008 | |
BG | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 07.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
GB | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
TR | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
GB | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
AT | 04.12.2013 | ||
GB | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/51] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
GB | 04.12.2013 | ||
IE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IE | 04.12.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
CH | 31.12.2013 | ||
LI | 31.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
MC | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
LU | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
ES | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
IT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
CZ | 07.08.2013 | ||
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
EE | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
SK | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
RO | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
DK | 07.08.2013 | ||
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 07.08.2013 | |
FI | 07.08.2013 | ||
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | FI | 07.08.2013 | |
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
NL | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | FI | 07.08.2013 | |
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
LV | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
SI | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
GR | 08.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | FI | 07.08.2013 | |
HR | 07.08.2013 | ||
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
PL | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 07.08.2013 | |
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
CY | 18.09.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
IS | 07.12.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 07.08.2013 | |
LT | 07.08.2013 | ||
SE | 07.08.2013 | ||
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 07.08.2013 | |
NO | 07.11.2013 | ||
PT | 09.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | NO | 07.11.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0055888 (GATES RUBBER CO [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 13, lines 6-25; figures 5-7; claims 9,14,15 *; | [X]US4505996 (SIMONTON ROBERT D [US]) [X] 1-9 * figures 1-5; claim 1 *; | [X]WO8903596 (TAMMINEN PENTTI JUUSE [FI]) [X] 1-9 * figures 1-4; claims 1,11 *; | [X]WO9210858 (GLOBE UNION INC [US]) [X] 1-9 * page 7, lines 9-29; figures 2,4,5 *; | [A]US5531601 (AMOROSO EUGENE C [US]) [A] 1-9* the whole document *; | [X]US5882362 (MUFFOLETTO BARRY C [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * column 1, lines 39-44; figures 1-16 * * column 3, lines 1-13 * * column 4, line 55 - column 5, line 60 * | Examination | EP0845821 | WO0041252 | by applicant | EP0055888 | US4505996 | WO8903596 | WO9210858 | US5882362 |