EP2359371 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TEMPERATURE-BASED DATA REFRESH IN NON-VOLATILE MEMORIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.10.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.11.2017 [2017/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Memory Technologies LLC 6787 W. Tropicana Ave., Suite 238 Las Vegas, NV 89103 / US | [2013/29] |
Former [2011/34] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NURMINEN, Janne, Tapani Honkakuja, 3 90460 Oulunsalo / FI | 02 /
MYLLY, Kimmo, Juhani Liisanniityntie, 20 33480 Ylöjärvi / FI | 03 /
FLOMAN, Matti, Kalevi Suoramantie, 25 36220 Kangasala / FI | [2011/48] |
Former [2011/34] | 01 /
NURMINEN, Janne, Tapani Honkakuja 3 FIN-90460 Oulunsalo / FI | ||
02 /
MYLLY, Kimmo, Juhani Liisanniityntie 20 FIN-33480 Ylöjärvi / FI | |||
03 /
FLOMAN, Matti, Kalevi Suoramantie 25 FIN-36220 Kangasala / FI | Representative(s) | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Swindell & Pearson Limited 48 Friar Gate Derby DE1 1GY / GB | ||
Former [2011/34] | Aarnio, Ari Antero Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department PO Box 407 00045 Nokia Group / FI | Application number, filing date | 08875014.6 | 11.11.2008 | [2011/34] | WO2008EP09511 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010054670 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2359371 | Date: | 24.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G11C16/34, G11C11/406, G11C7/04 | [2011/34] | CPC: |
G11C7/04 (EP,US);
G11C16/3418 (US);
G11C11/406 (EP,US);
G11C11/40626 (EP,US);
G11C13/0033 (EP,US);
G11C13/0035 (EP,US);
G11C13/0069 (EP,US);
G11C16/14 (EP,US);
G11C16/26 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/34] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM DATENAUFFRISCHEN AUF TEMPERATURBASIS IN NICHTFLÜCHTIGEN SPEICHERN | [2011/34] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TEMPERATURE-BASED DATA REFRESH IN NON-VOLATILE MEMORIES | [2011/34] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE RAFRAÎCHISSEMENT DE DONNÉES SELON LA TEMPÉRATURE DANS DES MÉMOIRES RÉMANENTES | [2011/34] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/34] | 01.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/45] | 30.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 15.06.2011 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   15.06.2011 | 30.11.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2002149986 (WONG SAU CHING [US]) [Y] 4,6,13,15-17* paragraph [0036] *; | [XA]US2007211548 (JAIN SANDEEP [US], et al) [X] 8-9 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0067]; figure 1 * [A] 10-12,18-19; | [XYI]EP1858021 (QIMONDA AG [DE]) [X] 1,7,10,18-19,21 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0036]; figure 1 * [Y] 3-6,12-17,20 [I] 2,11; | [Y]EP1933327 (QIMONDA NORTH AMERICA CORP [US]) [Y] 3,12 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0054]; figures 4-8 *; | [A]US2008170431 (SHEU SHYH-SHYUAN [TW], et al) [A] 3,12 * claims 1,2 *; | [YA]US2008215802 (CHOW DAVID Q [US], et al) [Y] 20 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0060]; figures 1A-1D * [A] 10-12,18-19; | [Y]US2008259708 (TSUKAZAKI FUMIAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 4-5,13-14 * paragraphs [0045] , [0046] , [0055] - [0058] * |