EP2350357 - A SUBSTRATE HOLDER FOR HOLDING A CONDUCTIVE SUBSTRATE DURING PLATING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/31] | A SYSTEM FOR PLATING A CONDUCTIVE SUBSTRATE, AND A SUBSTRATE HOLDER FOR HOLDING A CONDUCTIVE SUBSTRATE DURING PLATING THEREOF | ||
[2019/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Luxembourg Institute of Science and Technology 5 avenue des Hauts-Fourneaux 4362 Esch-sur-Alzette / LU | [2019/33] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states Centre de Recherche Public - Gabriel Lippmann 41, Rue du Brill 4422 Belvaux / LU | ||
Former [2011/31] | For all designated states Replisaurus Group SAS Le Soleil Levant, Immeuble Sendaï 11 chemin des Anciennes Vignes 69410 Champagne au Mont d'Or / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREDENBERG, Mikael St. Eriksgatan 41 S-112 34 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
MÖLLER, Patrik Flemminggatan 61, 3tr SE-112 32 Stockholm / SE | [2011/41] |
Former [2011/31] | 01 /
FREDENBERG, Mikael St. Eriksgatan 41 S-112 34 Stockholm / SE | ||
02 /
MÖLLER, Patrik Norra Agnegatan 38 S-112 29 Stochholm / SE | Representative(s) | Lecomte & Partners 76-78, rue de Merl 2146 Luxembourg / LU | [2019/34] |
Former [2012/51] | Wagner, Jean-Paul Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2012/49] | Lecomte & Partners P.O. Box 1623 1016 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2011/31] | Ström & Gulliksson AB Järnvägsgatan 3 252 24 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 08875022.9 | 14.11.2008 | [2011/31] | WO2008EP09658 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010054677 | Date: | 20.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2350357 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2350357 | Date: | 21.08.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C25D17/00, C25D17/06 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
C25D17/06 (EP,KR,US);
C25D17/00 (KR);
C25D17/005 (EP,US);
C25D17/001 (EP,US);
C25D17/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/34] |
Former [2011/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTRATHALTER ZUM HALTEN EINES LEITFÄHIGEN SUBSTRATS WÄHREND DES GALVANISIERENS | [2019/10] | English: | A SUBSTRATE HOLDER FOR HOLDING A CONDUCTIVE SUBSTRATE DURING PLATING THEREOF | [2019/10] | French: | PORTE-SUBSTRAT POUR MAINTENIR UN SUBSTRAT CONDUCTEUR PENDANT LE PLACAGE DE CELUI-CI | [2019/10] |
Former [2011/31] | SYSTEM ZUM GALVANISIEREN EINES LEITFÄHIGEN SUBSTRATS UND SUBSTRATHALTER ZUM HALTEN EINES LEITFÄHIGEN SUBSTRATS WÄHREND DES GALVANISIERENS | ||
Former [2011/31] | A SYSTEM FOR PLATING A CONDUCTIVE SUBSTRATE, AND A SUBSTRATE HOLDER FOR HOLDING A CONDUCTIVE SUBSTRATE DURING PLATING THEREOF | ||
Former [2011/31] | SYSTÈME DE PLACAGE D UN SUBSTRAT CONDUCTEUR ET PORTE-SUBSTRAT POUR MAINTENIR UN SUBSTRAT CONDUCTEUR PENDANT LE PLACAGE DE CELUI-CI | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2010 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/31] | 19.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.09.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.11.2008 | CY | 21.08.2019 | CZ | 21.08.2019 | EE | 21.08.2019 | ES | 21.08.2019 | HR | 21.08.2019 | LT | 21.08.2019 | LV | 21.08.2019 | MC | 21.08.2019 | MT | 21.08.2019 | NL | 21.08.2019 | PL | 21.08.2019 | RO | 21.08.2019 | SI | 21.08.2019 | SK | 21.08.2019 | TR | 21.08.2019 | IE | 14.11.2019 | BG | 21.11.2019 | NO | 21.11.2019 | GR | 22.11.2019 | BE | 30.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | IS | 21.12.2019 | PT | 23.12.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 14.11.2008 | |
CY | 21.08.2019 | ||
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | CY | 21.08.2019 | |
CZ | 21.08.2019 | ||
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | CZ | 21.08.2019 | |
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
BE | 30.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | CZ | 21.08.2019 | |
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
IE | 14.11.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | CZ | 21.08.2019 | |
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SI | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | CZ | 21.08.2019 | |
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
MC | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | CZ | 21.08.2019 | |
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | CZ | 21.08.2019 | |
EE | 21.08.2019 | ||
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
SK | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | EE | 21.08.2019 | |
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | EE | 21.08.2019 | |
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
PL | 21.08.2019 | ||
RO | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | EE | 21.08.2019 | |
ES | 21.08.2019 | ||
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | ES | 21.08.2019 | |
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
TR | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | ES | 21.08.2019 | |
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
IS | 21.12.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | ES | 21.08.2019 | |
HR | 21.08.2019 | ||
LT | 21.08.2019 | ||
LV | 21.08.2019 | ||
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
GR | 22.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | LT | 21.08.2019 | |
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
BG | 21.11.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
PT | 23.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | LT | 21.08.2019 | |
NL | 21.08.2019 | ||
NO | 21.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 21.08.2019 | |
NO | 21.11.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0003071 (SEMITOOL INC [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,10-19,26 * figures 6,9,16; claims 5-13,26,29 * * page 4, paragraph L * * page 12, paragraph 2 - page 13, paragraph 1 * * page 19, paragraph L * * page 22, paragraph 2 * [I] 4,6,9,20-25,27-34; | [XI]US2004074762 (KEIGLER ARTHUR [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7-20,22,24-26,29,31-33 * figures 1-4; claims 18,20,22 * * page 1, paragraphs 6,8 * * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 3, paragraph 28 * * page 3, paragraph 34 * * page 4, paragraph 45 * * page 5, paragraph 47 * [I] 4,6,21,23,27,28,30,34; | [A]US2007151858 (MOLLER PATRIK [SE], et al) [A] 1-34* page 4, paragraphs 47-52; figure 6 *; | [XI]US2008017503 (NAGASHIMA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 14-20,22-29,31-33 * figures 2-4; claims 1,2 * * page 1, paragraph 7 * * page 2, paragraphs 28,29 * * page 3, paragraphs 42-46 * [I] 21,30,34 |