EP2379102 - FIBCD1 FOR THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mucovax Inc. Winterbotham Place Marlborough and Queen Street PO Box N 3026 Nassau / BS | [2013/32] |
Former [2012/24] | For all designated states CMP Therapeutics Limited BioPark Broadwater Road Welwyn Garden City Hertfordshire AL7 3AX / GB | ||
Former [2011/43] | For all designated states Syddansk Universitet Campusvej 55 5230 Odense M / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOLMSKOV, Uffe c/o Syddansk Universitet Campusvej 55 DK-5230 Odense M / DK | 02 /
SCHLOSSER, Anders c/o Syddansk Universitet Campusvej 55 DK-5230 Odense M / DK | [2011/43] | Representative(s) | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/43] | Kiddle, Simon John, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 08875567.3 | 30.12.2008 | WO2008EP68362 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010075891 | Date: | 08.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2379102 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61K31/70, A61P1/00, A61P11/00 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
C07K16/28 (EP,US);
C07K16/34 (US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FIBCD1 ZUR PRÄVENTION UND BEHANDLUNG VON ERKRANKUNGEN | [2011/43] | English: | FIBCD1 FOR THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF DISEASES | [2011/43] | French: | FIBCD1 POUR LA PRÉVENTION ET LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES | [2011/43] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/43] | 16.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/27] | 21.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.07.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2011 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   12.06.2012 | 31.12.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03034984 (GENENTECH INC [US], et al) [X] 31-40 * page 1, lines 4-6; page 7-8; page 10, line 22; page 16, lines 6-9; page 22, lines 8-15; page 50; page 92-94; Claim 1,3; Figure 19; *; | [DY]US2008014281 (SHIBATA YOSHIMI [US], et al) [DY] 1-8,13,14,16,17,19 * paragraphs [0005] , [0056] - [0058] - [0082] *; | [XY]WO2008119356 (UNIV SYDDANSK [DK], et al) [X] 1-8,13,14,16,17,19 * page 1-3; page 5; table 1; example 1; figures; * [Y] 1-8,13,14,16,17,19; | [X] - BISSELL M J ET AL, "6th Pan Pacific Connective Tissue Societies Symposium", CONNECTIVE TISSUE RESEARCH, GORDON AND BREACH SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, US, (20060101), vol. 47, ISSN 0300-8207, pages 9 - 52, XP002488194 [X] 1,5,6 * page 50; * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/03008200600582599 | [A] - SCHLOSSER AG ET AL, Microfibril-Associated Protein 4 (MFAP4) and FReD-1. Two Members of the Fibrinogen Domain Superfamily, DENMARK, UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN DENMARK, (20040301), XP009103147 [A] 1-40 * page 5, Fig.1; page 7, Fig.3; page 11, par.2-4 to page 12, par.4; page 50-62; * | Examination | US2006141057 | - NAGATANI K ET AL, "739 Oral Chitin Administration Ameliorates Chronic Colitis in TCRalpha Knockout Mice By Upregulating IFNgamma-Production and Downregulating Chitinase 3-Like-1 Expression in Mucosal Tissues", GASTROENTEROLOGY, ELSEVIER, PHILADELPHIA, PA, vol. 134, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S0016-5085(08)60498-9, ISSN 0016-5085, (20080401), pages A - 106, (20080401), XP023432295 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5085(08)60498-9 |