EP2311149 - FEMALE TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.06.2011 [2011/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FCI 18 Parc Ariane III 3/5 Rue Alfred Kastler 78280 Guyancourt / FR | [2011/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MULOT, Gérard 26 rue du Général de Gaulle F-28210 Nogent Le Roi / FR | 02 /
ROZET, Dominique 10 rue Georges Péquin F-78120 Rambouillet / FR | 03 /
CASSES, Claude 8 Rue du Marché F-28300 Clevilliers / FR | 04 /
CAPPE, Patrice 7 Route de Rambouillet F-28210 Faverolles / FR | [2011/16] | Representative(s) | Regi, François-Xavier FCI - IP Department 18 Parc Ariane III 3/5 rue Alfred Kastler 78284 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | Regi, François-Xavier FCI - IP Department 18 Parc Ariane III 3/5 rue Alfred Kastler 78284 Guyancourt Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08875843.8 | 08.08.2008 | [2011/16] | WO2008IB54471 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010015894 | Date: | 11.02.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2311149 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/115 | [2011/16] | CPC: |
H01R13/115 (EP);
H01R13/113 (EP);
H01R13/112 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BUCHSENANSCHLUSS | [2011/16] | English: | FEMALE TERMINAL | [2011/16] | French: | BORNE FEMELLE | [2011/16] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.03.2011 | Examination requested [2011/16] | 22.04.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US3842391 (DECHELETTE H) [X] 1-5,7-11,13,14 * column 1, line 43 - column 1, line 45 * * figures 1-5 *; | [X]US4061406 (KUNKLE JOHN PHILIP) [X] 1,4-8,10-13,17 * column 3, line 57 - column 4, line 13 * * column 4, lines 36-40 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]US3634811 (TEAGNO WLADIMIRO ET AL) [X] 1,2,7,17 * column 2, lines 1-55 * * column 3, lines 25-45 * * figures 2,3 *; | [X]US7033194 (LE BEAU HOWARD STEPHEN [US]) [X] 1,4-7 * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 56 * * figures 1,2 * |