EP2373516 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION OF A HYBRID VEHICLE AND HYBRID VEHICLE ADAPTED TO SUCH A METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2011/41] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION OF A HYBRID AUTOMOTIVE AND VEHICLE ADAPTED TO SUCH A METHOD | ||
[2020/35] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volvo Lastvagnar AB 405 08 Göteborg / SE | [2020/40] |
Former [2015/08] | For all designated states Volvo Lastvagnar AB 405 08 Göteborg / SE | ||
Former [2011/41] | For all designated states Renault Trucks 99 Route de Lyon 69800 Saint Priest / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE BRUSQ, Philippe 4 allée du Parc F-69003 Lyon / FR | 02 /
MOTTIER, Michel Lou 2 rue de Genas F-69720 Saint Bonnet de Mure / FR | 03 /
MILLET, Michael Lieu dit Bale et Relandière F-38440 Moidieu-Detourbe / FR | [2011/41] | Representative(s) | Goreaud, Alexandra Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12 rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2020/40] |
Former [2011/41] | Putet, Gilles Renault Trucks VTEC France-Corporate Patents TER E70 2 12 99, route de Lyon 69806 Saint Priest Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 08875962.6 | 08.12.2008 | [2020/40] | WO2008IB55671 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010067147 | Date: | 17.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2373516 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2373516 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60W20/00, B60K6/48, B60L50/16 | [2020/34] | CPC: |
B60K6/48 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
B60L2250/16 (EP,US);
B60W2050/146 (EP);
B60W2510/244 (EP,US);
B60W50/14 (EP,US);
B60Y2200/14 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2011/41] | B60L11/14, B60K6/48, B60W20/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINES HYBRIDFAHRZEUGES UND HYBRIDFAHRZEUG MIT SOLCHEM VERFAHREN | [2020/34] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION OF A HYBRID VEHICLE AND HYBRID VEHICLE ADAPTED TO SUCH A METHOD | [2020/35] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DU FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE VÉHICULE HYBRIDE ET VÉHICULE HYBRIDE ADAPTÉ À UN TEL PROCÉDÉ | [2020/35] |
Former [2011/41] | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES HYBRIDKRAFTFAHRZEUGS UND FÜR SOLCH EIN VERFAHREN AUSGEFÜHRTES FAHRZEUG | ||
Former [2011/41] | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING OPERATION OF A HYBRID AUTOMOTIVE AND VEHICLE ADAPTED TO SUCH A METHOD | ||
Former [2011/41] | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DU FONCTIONNEMENT D'UNE AUTOMOBILE HYBRIDE ET VÉHICULE ADAPTÉ À UN TEL PROCÉDÉ | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2011 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/41] | 12.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 25.08.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.08.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2018 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.12.2008 | AT | 30.09.2020 | CY | 30.09.2020 | CZ | 30.09.2020 | DK | 30.09.2020 | EE | 30.09.2020 | ES | 30.09.2020 | FI | 30.09.2020 | HR | 30.09.2020 | IT | 30.09.2020 | LT | 30.09.2020 | LV | 30.09.2020 | MC | 30.09.2020 | MT | 30.09.2020 | PL | 30.09.2020 | RO | 30.09.2020 | SE | 30.09.2020 | SI | 30.09.2020 | SK | 30.09.2020 | TR | 30.09.2020 | IE | 08.12.2020 | LU | 08.12.2020 | BG | 30.12.2020 | GB | 30.12.2020 | NO | 30.12.2020 | BE | 31.12.2020 | CH | 31.12.2020 | GR | 31.12.2020 | LI | 31.12.2020 | IS | 30.01.2021 | PT | 01.02.2021 | [2022/34] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 08.12.2008 | |
AT | 30.09.2020 | ||
CY | 30.09.2020 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
MT | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
TR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
LU | 08.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
GB | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
TR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
LU | 08.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
GB | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
LU | 08.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
GB | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
LU | 08.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
GB | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
LU | 08.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
GB | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
CH | 31.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
LI | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SI | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
LU | 08.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
GB | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
IT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
LU | 08.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
LU | 08.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
IE | 08.12.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
MC | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
DK | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/28] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
SK | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
ES | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
PL | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
IS | 30.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 30.09.2020 | |
CZ | 30.09.2020 | ||
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/22] | CZ | 30.09.2020 | |
EE | 30.09.2020 | ||
FI | 30.09.2020 | ||
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
RO | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
PT | 01.02.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LT | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
HR | 30.09.2020 | ||
LV | 30.09.2020 | ||
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
GR | 31.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
SE | 30.09.2020 | ||
BG | 30.12.2020 | ||
NO | 30.12.2020 | ||
Former [2021/07] | FI | 30.09.2020 | |
NO | 30.12.2020 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1113943 (PAICE CORP [US]) [X] 1-13 * paragraph [0146] - paragraph [0192]; figures 6-9 *; | [X]GB2416617 (FORD MOTOR CO [US]) [X] 1-13 * abstract * * page 2, line 36 - page 7, line 11; figures 1,2A,2B,3 *; | [X]EP1632378 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-13 * abstract *; | [X]JP2006290182 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]US2008243324 (HARRIS WARNER OLAN [US]) [A] 1-13* abstract * | by applicant | WO2008IB55671 |