EP2362892 - HYDROPROCESSING OF BIODIESEL FUELS AND BLENDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.02.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 25.08.2021 [2021/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Research and Engineering Company 1545 Route 22 East P.O. Box 900 Annandale, NJ 08801-0900 / US | [2011/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOVAK, William, J. 230 Old Farm Road Bedminster NJ 07921 / US | 02 /
HOU, Zhiguo 2216 Evening Sun Road Nazareth PA 18064 / US | 03 /
TRACY, III, William, J. 9942 Wood Grouse Court Burke VA 22015 / US | 04 /
HANKS, Patrick, L. 12660 Marcum Court Fairfax Virginia 22033 / US | 05 /
HILBERT, Timothy, L. 12811 Dogwood Hills Lane Fairfax VA 22033 / US | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/36] | 01 /
NOVAK, William, J. 230 Old Farm Road Bedminster NJ 07921 / US | ||
02 /
HOU, Zhiguo 2216 Evening Sun Road Nazareth PA 18064 / US | |||
03 /
TRACY, III, William, J. 9942 Wood Grouse Court Burke VA 22015 / US | |||
04 /
HANKS, Patrick, L. 14 Saint Andrews Lane Annandale NJ 08801 / US | |||
05 /
HILBERT, Timothy, L. 12811 Dogwood Hills Lane Fairfax VA 22033 / US | Representative(s) | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe LLC IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/16] | ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | ||
Former [2014/44] | Mareschal, Anne, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Shared Services Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | ||
Former [2011/36] | Wall, Leythem, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Shared Services Hermeslaan 2 1831 MACHELEN / BE | Application number, filing date | 08876362.8 | 06.11.2008 | [2019/16] | WO2008US12516 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010053468 | Date: | 14.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2362892 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2362892 | Date: | 17.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C10G45/64, C10G65/04, C10L1/02, C10L1/08 | [2011/36] | CPC: |
C10G45/64 (EP,US);
C10L1/08 (US);
C10L1/026 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1014 (EP,US);
C10G2300/1018 (EP,US);
C10G2300/202 (EP,US);
C10G2300/301 (EP,US);
C10G2300/304 (EP,US);
C10G2300/307 (EP,US);
C10G2300/4018 (EP,US);
C10G2400/04 (EP,US);
C10L2200/0469 (US);
C10L2270/026 (US);
C10L2290/06 (US);
C10L2290/54 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/16] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRIERUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON BIODIESELKRAFTSTOFFEN UND MISCHUNGEN | [2018/45] | English: | HYDROPROCESSING OF BIODIESEL FUELS AND BLENDS | [2011/36] | French: | HYDROTRAITEMENT DE BIOCARBURANTS DIESELS ET DE MÉLANGES | [2011/36] |
Former [2011/36] | HYDROPROCESSING VON BIODIESEL-KRAFTSTOFFEN UND BLENDS | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2011 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 06.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 12.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2008 | AT | 17.04.2019 | CY | 17.04.2019 | CZ | 17.04.2019 | EE | 17.04.2019 | ES | 17.04.2019 | HR | 17.04.2019 | LT | 17.04.2019 | LV | 17.04.2019 | MC | 17.04.2019 | MT | 17.04.2019 | PL | 17.04.2019 | RO | 17.04.2019 | SI | 17.04.2019 | SK | 17.04.2019 | TR | 17.04.2019 | BG | 17.07.2019 | GR | 18.07.2019 | IS | 17.08.2019 | PT | 17.08.2019 | IE | 06.11.2019 | LU | 06.11.2019 | CH | 30.11.2019 | LI | 30.11.2019 | [2021/34] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 06.11.2008 | |
AT | 17.04.2019 | ||
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
IE | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CY | 17.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
IE | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
IE | 06.11.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
MC | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
LU | 06.11.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/34] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
CH | 30.11.2019 | ||
LI | 30.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SI | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
TR | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
EE | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
SK | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 17.04.2019 | |
CZ | 17.04.2019 | ||
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
RO | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 17.04.2019 | |
ES | 17.04.2019 | ||
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
IS | 17.08.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
PL | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
BG | 17.07.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
HR | 17.04.2019 | ||
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
LV | 17.04.2019 | ||
GR | 18.07.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
LT | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 17.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 17.04.2019 | |
LT | 17.04.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006234860 (BRIGNAC GARLAND B [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0028] *; | [Y]US2006264684 (PETRI JOHN A [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0013] , [0014]; claims 1,2 *; | [Y]WO2007003709 (NESTE OIL OYJ [FI], et al) [Y] 1-10 * figure 1; claims 1,8,9 *; | [A]WO2007033460 (CA MINISTER NATURAL RESOURCES [CA], et al) [A] 1-10* claims 1-3 *; | [Y]US2007131581 (LAI WENYIH F [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0033] , [0035]; claims 1,21,25,26 *; | [X]WO2008035155 (UNIV BEN GURION [IL], et al) [X] 1-10 * claims 1,10 *; | [X]WO2008101945 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 10, line 14 - line 20; claims 1,11,13 *; | [E]WO2009038965 (UOP LLC [US], et al) [E] 1-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0010] , [0012] , [0016] , [0017]; claims 1,6,10 * | by applicant | US2006207166 | US2006234860 | US2006264684 | WO2007003709 | US2007131581 | WO2008035155 | WO2008101945 | WO2009038965 |