EP2297244 - COMPOSITION, FILM AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.10.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avery Dennison Corporation 8080 Norton Parkway Mentor, OH 44060 / US | [2022/23] |
Former [2021/33] | For all designated states Avery Dennison Corporation 150 North Orange Grove Boulevard Pasadena, CA 91103-3596 / US | ||
Former [2011/12] | For all designated states Avery Dennison Corporation 150 North Orange Grove Boulevard Pasadena, CA 91103-3596 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIH, Frank, Y. 911 Palo Alto Drive Arcadia CA 91007 / US | [2011/12] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2011/12] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08876477.4 | 26.11.2008 | [2011/12] | WO2008US84812 | Priority number, date | WO1980US69706 | 10.07.2008 Original published format: PCT/US8069/706 | [2011/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010005452 | Date: | 14.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2297244 | Date: | 23.03.2011 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2011/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2297244 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08L31/04, C08L33/06, C08L75/04, C08J5/18, C08K3/22, B32B27/30, B41M5/52, C08K3/00, C08K5/00 | [2011/12] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,CN);
B32B27/08 (EP,CN);
B32B27/20 (EP,CN);
B32B27/22 (EP,CN);
B32B27/306 (EP,CN);
B32B27/308 (EP,CN);
B32B27/40 (EP,CN);
B32B7/12 (EP,CN);
B41M5/52 (EP,CN);
C08K3/22 (EP);
C08L31/04 (EP,CN);
C08L33/00 (CN);
C08L33/06 (EP);
C08L33/08 (EP);
C08L75/04 (CN);
C09D131/04 (EP);
C09D133/08 (EP);
B32B2264/102 (EP,CN);
B32B2270/00 (EP,CN);
B32B2307/3065 (EP,CN);
B32B2307/4026 (EP,CN);
B32B2307/41 (EP,CN);
B32B2307/54 (EP,CN);
B32B2307/71 (EP,CN);
B32B2307/712 (EP,CN);
B32B2307/75 (EP,CN);
B32B2405/00 (EP,CN);
B32B2451/00 (EP,CN);
B32B2519/00 (EP,CN);
B32B2607/00 (EP,CN);
B41M5/5254 (EP,CN);
B41M5/5281 (EP,CN);
C08J2331/04 (EP,CN);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/22, C08L31/04 (EP);
C08K3/22, C08L33/06 (EP);
C08L31/04, C08L101/00, C08K2003/2241 (CN);
C08L31/04, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L31/04, C08L31/04, C08K2003/2241 (CN);
C08L33/06, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L33/08, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C09D131/04, C08L2666/04 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/33] |
Former [2011/12] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, FOLIE UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2011/12] | English: | COMPOSITION, FILM AND RELATED METHODS | [2011/12] | French: | COMPOSITION, FILM ET PROCÉDÉS APPARENTÉS | [2011/12] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2011 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2011 | Examination requested [2011/12] | 18.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 03.11.2020 | 30.10.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.02.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11004518.4 / EP2363427 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.11.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.12.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.02.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.11.2008 | AT | 18.08.2021 | CY | 18.08.2021 | CZ | 18.08.2021 | DK | 18.08.2021 | EE | 18.08.2021 | ES | 18.08.2021 | FI | 18.08.2021 | HR | 18.08.2021 | IT | 18.08.2021 | LT | 18.08.2021 | LV | 18.08.2021 | MC | 18.08.2021 | MT | 18.08.2021 | NL | 18.08.2021 | PL | 18.08.2021 | RO | 18.08.2021 | SE | 18.08.2021 | SI | 18.08.2021 | SK | 18.08.2021 | BG | 18.11.2021 | NO | 18.11.2021 | GR | 19.11.2021 | IE | 26.11.2021 | LU | 26.11.2021 | BE | 30.11.2021 | IS | 18.12.2021 | PT | 20.12.2021 | [2024/41] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 26.11.2008 | |
AT | 18.08.2021 | ||
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IE | 26.11.2021 | ||
LU | 26.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2023/24] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CY | 18.08.2021 | ||
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IE | 26.11.2021 | ||
LU | 26.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IE | 26.11.2021 | ||
LU | 26.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
IT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SI | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
LU | 26.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
LU | 26.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
MC | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
BE | 30.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
CZ | 18.08.2021 | ||
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
EE | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
RO | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
SK | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
DK | 18.08.2021 | ||
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/16] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
NL | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/11] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
HR | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
LV | 18.08.2021 | ||
PL | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
GR | 19.11.2021 | ||
IS | 18.12.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
PT | 20.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
ES | 18.08.2021 | ||
FI | 18.08.2021 | ||
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
SE | 18.08.2021 | ||
BG | 18.11.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 18.08.2021 | |
LT | 18.08.2021 | ||
NO | 18.11.2021 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4069186 (RAMIG ALEX) [X] 1,2,8,9,18-21 * example -; claim -; table 10 *; | [X]EP0538173 (IMP PAK PACKAGING CORP [CA]) [X] 1,2,8,9,18-21 * column 6, line 43 - line 49; example -; claim - *; | [X]EP1180436 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [X] 1-21 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO0236353 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9,18-21 * page 26, line 31 - line 36 * * page 27, line 34 - line 35 * * page 30, line 25 - line 31; claim -; table IX *; | [X]WO0248260 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO02062894 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO03016045 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,8,9,18-21 * figure 3; examples I-XX; claim - *; | [X]WO03037614 (AVERY DENNISON CORP [US]) [X] 1-21 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO03080356 (UCB SA [BE], et al) [A] 1 * page 10, line 25 - line 38; examples 1,3,4,7,10 *; | [X]WO03093357 (HYDROMER INC [US]) [X] 1-21* example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2004003093 (UCB SA [BE], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9,18-21 * examples 3-14; claim -; table 3 *; | [X]US2004048073 (BACON CHESTER A [US]) [X] 1-12,18-21 * example -; claim - *; | [X]WO2004060686 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [X] 1-21 * example -; claim - * | Examination | WO2004060687 |