EP2343655 - MEMORY ACCESS METHOD AND INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.2013 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | For all designated states Fujitsu Limited 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
UKAI, Masaki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
UNNO, Hideyuki c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
YOKOI, Megumi c/o FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2011/28] | Representative(s) | Keltsch, Ulrike Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | Holz, Ulrike Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08877159.7 | 02.10.2008 | [2011/28] | WO2008JP67940 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010038301 | Date: | 08.04.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2343655 | Date: | 13.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.04.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/08 | [2011/28] | CPC: |
G06F12/0817 (EP,US);
G06F12/082 (EP,US);
G06F12/0822 (EP,US);
G06F12/0831 (EP,US);
G06F2212/1024 (EP,US);
G06F2212/1048 (EP,US);
G06F2212/2542 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2011/28] | Title | German: | SPEICHERZUGRIFFSVERFAHREN UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2011/28] | English: | MEMORY ACCESS METHOD AND INFORMATION PROCESSING APPARATUS | [2011/28] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ACCÈS À UNE MÉMOIRE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2011/28] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2011 | Translation filed | 27.04.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2011 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2011 | Examination requested [2011/28] | 18.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2013 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5522058 (IWASA SHIGEAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * column 1, line 28 - column 3, line 3 * * column 12, line 6 - line 42 * * column 15, line 30 - column 16, line 25 * * column 26, line 40 - column 27, line 48 * * figures 3, 5, 9A, 9B, 15-17, 20-21 * [Y] 7-15; | [YA]US2003005237 (DHONG SANG HOO [US], et al) [Y] 8-10,12-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0 24] , [0 26] * * figure 2 * [A] 1-7,11,15; | [YA]US2003131200 (BERG THOMAS B [US], et al) [Y] 7,11,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0074] * * figure 3 * [A] 1-6,8,10,12; | [A]US2001034816 (MICHAEL MAGED M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0023] * | International search | [X]JPH06110844 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]JP2005539282 (INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORP.); | [Y]JP2000298659 (IBM) | by applicant | JPH11232173 | JPH05100952 | JP2005234854 |