15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
03.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
19.12.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
12.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.10.2014 [2014/42] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
22.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
10.01.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
04.01.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
04.01.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.09.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
09.08.2013 |
Change - German title |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
09.08.2013 |
Change - French title |
published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |
23.07.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.05.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.01.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.01.2013 |
First examination report |
|
21.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.10.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
10.02.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
29.12.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.08.2011 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] |
19.08.2011 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 21.09.2011 [2011/38] |
03.08.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.07.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.08.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.07.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.06.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.05.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|