Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010065042 | Global Dossier | 26.08.2010 | A3 | WO2010065042 | 10.06.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85732 | 05.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8691034 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2014 | B2 | US2011232830 | 29.09.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85732 | 05.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5356534B | Global Dossier | 04.12.2013 | B2 | JP2012510392 | 10.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85732 | 05.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2365904 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2014 | B1 | EP2365904 | 21.09.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85732 | 05.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0823333 | 05.01.2016 | A8 | BRPI0823333 | 23.06.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85732 | 05.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102223999B | 09.04.2014 | B | CN102223999 | 19.10.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85732 | 05.12.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2011127431 | 10.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008US85732 | 05.12.2008 |