EP2040068 - Nucleic acid detection sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2009/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Koji c/o Intellectual Property Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Miyamoto, Hirohisa c/o Intellectual Property Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
Itsumi, Kazuhiro c/o Intellectual Property Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
Suzuki, Kouhei c/o Intellectual Property Division Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | Granleese, Rhian Jane Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 09000124.9 | 25.09.2001 | [2009/13] | Priority number, date | JP20000301516 | 29.09.2000 Original published format: JP 2000301516 | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2040068 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2040068 | Date: | 22.09.2010 | [2010/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/403, C12Q1/68, G01N33/543 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6825 (EP,US);
G01N27/3276 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00608 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0061 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00612 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00621 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00626 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0063 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00637 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6825, C12Q2565/607 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/13] | Title | German: | Nukleinsäurenachweissensor | [2009/13] | English: | Nucleic acid detection sensor | [2009/13] | French: | Capteur de détection d'acides nucléiques | [2009/13] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 23.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/45] | 16.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/45] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01308139.3 / EP1211507 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010308139) is 04.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5945286 (KRIHAK MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * column 1, line 35 - line 51 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 18 *; | [Y]WO9951778 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US], et al) [Y] 1-19 * page 8, line 25 - line 31; figure 1 *; | [Y] - FIACCABRINO G C ET AL, "Array of individually addressable microelectrodes", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, CH LNKD- DOI:10.1016/0925-4005(93)01126-O, vol. 19, no. 1-3, ISSN 0925-4005, (19940401), pages 675 - 677, (19940401), XP026570910 [Y] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-4005(93)01126-O | [A] - WANG J ET AL, "Nucleic-acid immobilization, recognition and detection at chronopotentiometric DNA chips", BIOSENSORS AND BIOELECTRONICS, ELSEVIER BV, NL LNKD- DOI:10.1016/S0956-5663(96)00076-0, (19970101), vol. 12, no. 7, ISSN 0956-5663, pages 587 - 599, XP002113741 [A] 1-19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0956-5663(96)00076-0 |