EP2079243 - Image processor, image processing method and computer program [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ikeyama, Tetsuo Room 352 Sokoryo 174-7 Hayakawa-cho Yaita-shi Tochigi 329-2141 / JP | 02 /
Koike, Akira 66-7 Suehiro Yaita-shi Tochigi 329-2162 / JP | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/29] | 01 /
Ikeyama, Tesuo Room 352 Sokoryo 174-7 Hayakawa-cho Yaita-shi Tochigi 329-2141 / JP | ||
02 /
Koike, Akira 66-7 Suehiro Yaita-shi Tochigi 329-2162 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09000148.8 | 08.01.2009 | [2009/29] | Priority number, date | JP20080002593 | 09.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008002593 | [2009/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2079243 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2079243 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/64, // H04N9/73, G09G5/02 | [2011/04] | CPC: |
H04N9/73 (EP,US);
G09G3/2003 (EP,US);
H04N1/6077 (EP,US);
H04N1/62 (EP,US);
H04N1/628 (EP,US);
H04N23/88 (EP);
H04N9/643 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0242 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0666 (EP,US);
G09G2340/06 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/29] | H04N9/64, // H04N9/73 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/39] |
Former [2009/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungssystem, Bildverarbeitungsverfahren und Computerprogramm | [2009/29] | English: | Image processor, image processing method and computer program | [2009/29] | French: | Processeur d'images, procédé de traitement d'images et programme informatique | [2009/29] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/36] | 27.07.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.09.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 29.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]EP1599052 (SONY CORP [JP]) [I] 1,2,4,5,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0058] * * figures 2,4 * [Y] 3,6,9; | [Y] - OKANO, Y.; SHIOTANI, N., "Color Reproduction Characteristics of Liquid Crystal Display Panels and New Compensation Methods for Them", SHARP TECHNICAL JOURNAL, (200108), vol. 3, XP002613876 [Y] 3,6,9 * abstract * * section 2 * * figure 3 * | Examination | US6744920 | by applicant | JP2006237798 | JP2007142983 |