EP2090852 - Air conditioning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Calsonic Kansei Corporation 1917, Nisson-cho 2-chome Kita-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 331-8501 / JP | [2009/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Torahide Calsonic Kansei Corporation 1917, Nisshin-cho 2-chome Kita-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 331-8501 / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Kojiro Calsonic Kansei Corporation 1917, Nisshin-cho 2-chome Kita-ku Saitama-shi Saitama 331-8501 / JP | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09000435.9 | 14.01.2009 | [2009/34] | Priority number, date | JP20080033718 | 14.02.2008 Original published format: JP 2008033718 | [2009/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2090852 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/34] | Classification | IPC: | F25B41/00, B60H1/32 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
B60H1/00878 (EP,US);
F25B41/00 (EP,US);
F25B41/30 (EP,US);
B60H2001/00928 (EP,US);
F25B2339/047 (EP,US);
F25B2400/23 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Klimaanlagensystem | [2009/34] | English: | Air conditioning system | [2009/34] | French: | Système de climatisation | [2009/34] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | JP2002098430 |