EP2081072 - Imaging device for microscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states Olympus Corp. 43-2 Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kishida, Hironori c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | 02 /
Kojima, Jitsunari c/o Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/41] |
Former [2009/30] | 01 /
Kishida, Hironori c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
02 /
Kojima, Jitsunari c/o Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09000586.9 | 16.01.2009 | [2009/30] | Priority number, date | JP20080008976 | 18.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008008976 | [2009/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2081072 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G02B21/36 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
G02B21/365 (EP,US);
H04N23/69 (EP,US);
H04N23/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2010/13] |
Former [2009/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Abbildungseinrichtung für ein Mikroskop | [2009/30] | English: | Imaging device for microscope | [2009/30] | French: | Dispositif d'imagerie pour un microscope | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 06.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 23.01.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/52] | 02.08.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.03.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4661692 (KAWASAKI MASAMI [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * column 5, line 19 - column 6, line 3; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]JP2001313869 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]US2003043292 (PYLE NORMAN C [US], et al) [A] 1* claim 1 *; | [A]US2006268151 (YAMASHITA YUICHIRO [JP]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * | Examination | US2002047912 | by applicant | US4661692 | JP2001313869 |