EP2082880 - Liquid ejecting head, liquid ejecting apparatus, and method for manufacturing liquid ejecting head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.09.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakai, Toshifumi c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Nagate, Toru c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2012/45] |
Former [2009/31] | 01 /
Sakai, Toshifumi c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | ||
02 /
Nagate, Toru c/o SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi Nagano 392-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09000678.4 | 19.01.2009 | [2009/31] | Priority number, date | JP20080011215 | 22.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008011215 | JP20080237528 | 17.09.2008 Original published format: JP 2008237528 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2082880 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2082880 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/14 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
B41J2/14233 (EP,US);
B41J2/055 (EP,US);
B41J2002/14419 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/14] |
Former [2009/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsausgabekopf, Flüssigkeitsausgabevorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Flüssigkeitsausgabekopfes | [2009/31] | English: | Liquid ejecting head, liquid ejecting apparatus, and method for manufacturing liquid ejecting head | [2009/31] | French: | Tête d'éjection de liquide, appareil d'éjection de liquide et procédé de fabrication de la tête d'éjection de liquide | [2009/31] | Examination procedure | 28.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 02.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 08.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1504902 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4,6 * paragraph [0016] *; | [A]US2002109744 (SHINDO TATSUYA [JP]) [A] 3,5 * paragraph [0043]; figures 6,7a *; | [A]EP1498268 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4,6 * paragraphs [0079] , [0081] *; | [A]US2005040581 (ITO ATSUSHI [JP]) [A] 1,4,6 * paragraphs [0024] - [0026] - [0029] , [0105] *; | [PA]US2008079777 (WATANABE HIDETOSHI [JP]) [PA] 1,4,6 * figures 3-5 *; | [PA]US2008309735 (WATANABE HIDETOSHI [JP]) [PA] 1,4,6 * figures 3,4 * | by applicant | EP1504902 |