EP2080632 - Thermal transfer member, thermal transfer member set, and recording method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shinohara, Satoru SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-00775 / JP | 02 /
Tanba, Katsuya SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-00775 / JP | 03 /
Hida, Masanobu SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-00775 / JP | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/30] | 01 /
Shinohara, Satoru SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-775 / JP | ||
02 /
Tanba, Katsuya SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-775 / JP | |||
03 /
Hida, Masanobu SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-775 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Straße 17 D-81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09000726.1 | 20.01.2009 | [2009/30] | Priority number, date | JP20080010872 | 21.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008010872 | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2080632 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2080632 | Date: | 15.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/385, B41M5/39, B41M5/388 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
B41M5/3852 (EP,US);
B41M5/3854 (EP,US);
B41M5/3858 (EP,US);
B41M5/388 (EP,US);
B41M5/39 (EP,US);
B41M2205/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/13] |
Former [2009/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wärmeübertragungselement, Wärmeübertragungselementensatz und Aufzeichnungsverfahren | [2009/30] | English: | Thermal transfer member, thermal transfer member set, and recording method | [2009/30] | French: | Éléments de transfert thermique, jeu d'éléments de transfert thermique et procédé d'enregistrement | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 18.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/34] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH11334216 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-5,7-11,13,15 * claim 1 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] * * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0028] *; | [Y]US5369078 (EGUCHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-5,7-11,13,15 * column 27, lines 64-68 * * table 8; compound 28 *; | [A]JP2005271361 (KONICA MINOLTA PHOTO IMAGING) [A] 13,15 * figure 1 *; | [E]EP2030800 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [E] 1,2,4,5,7,8,10,11 * example 1 * * paragraphs [0169] , [0190] * * compounds Y-2,C-2 * | by applicant | JP2008010872 | JPS60239289 | JP3596921B | JPH0535079B | JPH07290847 | JPH08310136 | JP2005271361 |