EP2082873 - Separator for board-form elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3S Swiss Solar Systems AG Schachenweg 24 3250 Lyss / CH | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zahnd, Jürg Schulweg 15 3427 Utzenstorf / CH | 02 /
Chimenti, Alessandro Obere Zollgasse 51 d 3072 Ostermundigen / CH | 03 /
Polo, Roman Reiterstrasse 6 3013 Bern / CH | 04 /
Knaack, Ruben Weiherhofstrasse 146 4054 Basel / CH | 05 /
Strebel, Beat Oberdorfstrasse 6 4118 Rodersdorf / CH | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Secklehner, Günter Rechtsanwalts-OG Dr, Lindmayr, Dr. Bauer, Dr. Secklehner Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2009/31] | Application number, filing date | 09000824.4 | 22.01.2009 | [2009/31] | Priority number, date | AT20080000090 | 23.01.2008 Original published format: AT 902008 | [2009/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2082873 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/31] | Classification | IPC: | B32B38/18, B32B37/10 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
B32B37/0046 (EP,US);
B32B37/10 (EP,US);
B32B38/18 (EP,US);
B32B2457/12 (EP,US);
B32B37/1009 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Distanzelement fuer plattenfoermige Elemente | [2009/31] | English: | Separator for board-form elements | [2009/31] | French: | Elément de distance pour éléments en forme de plaques | [2009/31] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/08] | 05.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/08] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US6149757 |