EP2082680 - Capsule endoscope and method of controlling the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/31] | Capsule endoscope, method of controlling the same, and information manager | ||
[2014/45] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishino, Naoyuki c/o Fujifilm Corporation 798, Miyanodai Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa / JP | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09001047.1 | 26.01.2009 | [2009/31] | Priority number, date | JP20080016339 | 28.01.2008 Original published format: JP 2008016339 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2082680 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/04 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
A61B1/041 (EP,US);
A61B1/00009 (EP,US);
A61B1/00036 (EP,US);
A61B1/00016 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0209 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/31] | A61B1/05 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/14] |
Former [2009/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kapselendoskop und Verfahren zu dessen Steuerung | [2014/45] | English: | Capsule endoscope and method of controlling the same | [2014/45] | French: | Endoscope de capsule et son procédé de commande | [2014/45] |
Former [2009/31] | Kapselendoskop, Verfahren zu dessen Steuerung und Informationsverwalter | ||
Former [2009/31] | Capsule endoscope, method of controlling the same, and information manager | ||
Former [2009/31] | Endoscope de capsule, son procédé de commande, et gestionnaire d'informations | Examination procedure | 26.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/10] | 30.01.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 14.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO0187377 (GIVEN IMAGING LTD [IL], et al) [DA] 1-22* page 3, line 3 - page 4, line 29 *; | [X]WO2004054430 (GIVEN IMAGING LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1,17,19 * page 5, line 3 - page 7, line 10 * * page 8, line 27 - page 9, line 7 * * page 14, line 7 - page 15, line 32 *; | [X]US2005025368 (GLUKHOVSKY ARKADY [US]) [X] 1-6,9-22 * paragraphs [0002] , [0017] , [0020] , [0021] , [0027] , [0028] , [0031] - [0034] - [0038] - [0040] - [0043] , [0044] , [0074] - [0076]; figures 1,4 *; | [X]US2005192476 (HOMAN MASATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-22 * paragraphs [0006] , [0038] , [0041] - [0043] - [0062] - [0068] - [0138] - [0148] - [0157] - [0168]; figure 21 *; | [A]US2007142703 (LU YIQUN [CN]) [A] 1-22 * paragraphs [0004] , [0014] - [0016] * | by applicant | JP2000350099 | US6709387 | JP2004521662 | US6885399 | US7022067 | JP2006223892 |