EP2213400 - Wire electric discharge machining method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2010/31] | WEDM method and apparatus | ||
[2013/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agie Charmilles SA Via dei Pioppi 2 6616 Losone / CH | For all designated states CHARMILLES TECHNOLOGIES S.A. 8-10, rue du Pré-de-la-Fontaine 1217 Meyrin 1 / CH | [2010/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Angelella, Stefano Residenza al noce 6572 Quartino / CH | 02 /
Mazzolini, Livio Via Margiasco 6946 Ponte Capriasca / CH | 03 /
Candolfi, Stefano Via Pioda 33 6600 Locarno / CH | [2010/31] | Representative(s) | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Widenmayerstraße 6 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/31] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09001260.0 | 29.01.2009 | [2010/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2213400 | Date: | 04.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2213400 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23H7/06 | [2010/31] | CPC: |
B23H7/065 (EP,US);
B23H7/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für drahtschneidende elektrische Entladungsmaschine | [2010/31] | English: | Wire electric discharge machining method and apparatus | [2013/24] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour usinage par électroérosion par fil. | [2013/24] |
Former [2010/31] | WEDM method and apparatus | ||
Former [2010/31] | Procédé et appareil WEDM | Examination procedure | 30.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/41] | 08.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.01.2009 | AT | 12.06.2013 | BE | 12.06.2013 | CY | 12.06.2013 | CZ | 12.06.2013 | DK | 12.06.2013 | EE | 12.06.2013 | FI | 12.06.2013 | HR | 12.06.2013 | LT | 12.06.2013 | LV | 12.06.2013 | MC | 12.06.2013 | MK | 12.06.2013 | MT | 12.06.2013 | NL | 12.06.2013 | PL | 12.06.2013 | RO | 12.06.2013 | SE | 12.06.2013 | SI | 12.06.2013 | SK | 12.06.2013 | TR | 12.06.2013 | BG | 12.09.2013 | NO | 12.09.2013 | GR | 13.09.2013 | IS | 12.10.2013 | PT | 14.10.2013 | IE | 29.01.2014 | LU | 29.01.2014 | [2018/30] |
Former [2016/33] | HU | 29.01.2009 | |
AT | 12.06.2013 | ||
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
MT | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
TR | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 29.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 29.01.2009 | |
AT | 12.06.2013 | ||
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
MT | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 29.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CY | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
MT | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 29.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
MT | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 29.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
IE | 29.01.2014 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
LU | 29.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
MC | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
DK | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
NL | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
PL | 12.06.2013 | ||
RO | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
CZ | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
SK | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
IS | 12.10.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 12.06.2013 | |
BE | 12.06.2013 | ||
EE | 12.06.2013 | ||
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | BE | 12.06.2013 | |
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
PT | 14.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | IT | 29.01.2013 | |
FI | 12.06.2013 | ||
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/02] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
LV | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/51] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
HR | 12.06.2013 | ||
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
BG | 12.09.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | FI | 12.06.2013 | |
LT | 12.06.2013 | ||
SE | 12.06.2013 | ||
SI | 12.06.2013 | ||
NO | 12.09.2013 | ||
GR | 13.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 12.06.2013 | |
NO | 12.09.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4222186 (AGIE AG IND ELEKTRONIK [CH]) [A] 1-13 * column 4, line 33 - line 58 * * figure 4 *; | [A]JPH06143037 (SODICK CO LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]EP1769871 (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1-13* abstract * | by applicant | CH591919 | JPS59115125 | DE4222186 | EP0963272 | EP1769871 |