EP2146166 - Methanol plant retrofit for manufacture of acetic acid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acetex (Cyprus) Limited Nicolaou Pentadromos Centre, Office 908, Block A, P.O. Box 50123 Limassol 3601 / CY | [2010/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vidalin, Kenneth Ebennes Vancouver British Columbia V6E 1V6 / CA | 02 /
Thiebaut, Daniel Marcel 1 Impasse Jean Racine 64230 Lescar / FR | [2010/03] | Representative(s) | Ede, Eric Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Ede, Eric Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 09001457.2 | 31.10.2000 | [2010/03] | Priority number, date | US19990430888 | 01.11.1999 Original published format: US 430888 | US20000547831 | 12.04.2000 Original published format: US 547831 | [2010/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2146166 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2146166 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07C51/12, C07C53/08, C07C29/152, C07C67/36, C07C69/14, C07C69/06, C01B3/50, C01B3/38, C01C1/04, C01B13/02, C07C29/151, F25J3/02, F25J3/04 | [2013/42] | CPC: |
C07C67/36 (EP,US);
C01B13/0248 (EP,US);
C01B3/384 (EP,US);
C01B3/50 (EP,US);
C01C1/0488 (EP,US);
C07C29/1518 (EP,US);
C07C29/152 (EP,US);
C07C51/12 (EP,US);
F25J3/0223 (EP,US);
F25J3/0252 (EP,US);
F25J3/0261 (EP,US);
F25J3/04527 (EP,US);
F25J3/04587 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00024 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0233 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0405 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0415 (EP,US);
C01B2203/043 (EP,US);
C01B2203/046 (EP,US);
C01B2203/047 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0475 (EP,US);
C01B2203/061 (EP,US);
C01B2203/068 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0816 (EP,US);
C01B2203/0822 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1058 (EP,US);
C01B2203/1241 (EP,US);
C01B2203/148 (EP,US);
C01B2210/0046 (EP,US);
F25J2290/80 (EP,US);
Y02P20/10 (EP,US);
Y02P20/129 (EP,US);
Y02P20/151 (EP,US);
Y02P20/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/1518, C07C31/04 (EP,US);
C07C29/152, C07C31/04 (US,EP);
C07C51/12, C07C53/08 (EP,US);
C07C67/36, C07C69/06 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2012/51] | C07C51/12, C07C53/08, C07C29/152, C07C67/36, C07C69/14, C07C69/06, C01B3/50 | ||
Former IPC [2010/03] | F25J3/02, F25J3/04, C01C1/04, C07C51/12, C07C29/152, C07C53/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2010/03] | Title | German: | Methanolanlagennachrüstung zur Herstellung von Essigsäure | [2010/03] | English: | Methanol plant retrofit for manufacture of acetic acid | [2010/03] | French: | Solarisation de plante au méthanol pour la fabrication d'acide acétique | [2010/03] | Examination procedure | 18.06.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 25.09.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/35] | 14.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP00972559.9 / EP1226103 | EP06006456.5 / EP1683780 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20000972559) is 19.12.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 03.02.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.07.2009 | 03.02.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.07.2009 | 03.02.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.07.2009 | 03.02.2009 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   22.07.2009 | 03.02.2009 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   22.07.2009 | 03.02.2009 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   22.07.2009 | 03.02.2009 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   22.07.2009 | 31.10.2013 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4081253 (MARION CHARLES P) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1B * * column 7, lines 42-52 * * column 9, lines 40-50 * * column 12, lines 49-67 * * column 13, lines 36-54 * * claims 1,16,24 *; | [A]DE3712008 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0845452 (HALDOR TOPSOE AS [DK]) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** claim 1 * | by applicant | US1961736 | US3769329 | US4081253 | DE3712008 | US5155261 | US5672743 | US5728871 | EP0845452 | US5773642 | US5817869 | US5877347 | US5877348 | US5883289 | US5883295 |