EP2216837 - Piezoelectric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Physik Instrumente (PI) GmbH & Co. KG Auf der Römerstrasse 1 76228 Karlsruhe / DE | [2010/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koc, Burhanettin Leipziger Allee 20 76139 Karlsruhe / DE | 02 /
Delibas, Bülent Albert-Einstein-Strasse 44 76646 Bruchsal / DE | 03 /
Rothardt, Oliver Welfenstrasse 24 76137 Karlsruhe / DE | [2010/32] | Application number, filing date | 09001729.4 | 07.02.2009 | [2010/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2216837 | Date: | 11.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/09 | [2010/32] | CPC: |
H02N2/025 (EP);
H02N2/101 (EP);
H02N2/22 (EP);
H10N30/206 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/16] |
Former [2010/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Piezoelektrischer Motor | [2010/32] | English: | Piezoelectric motor | [2010/32] | French: | Moteur piézoélectrique | [2010/32] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/37] | 24.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/37] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0536832 (PHILIPS PATENTVERWALTUNG [DE], et al); | [X]US5233258 (MYOGA OSAMU [JP], et al); | [X]WO0250923 (PIEZOMOTOR UPPSALA AB [SE], et al); | [XY]WO2004082037 (LEUVEN K U RES & DEV [BE], et al); | [Y]WO2006035447 (NANOMOTION LTD [IL], et al); | by applicant | US2008073999 | US2008297923 |