EP2090844 - Hot water tank [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Robert Bosch GmbH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kröll, Ulrich Im Rotenbach 9 72654 Neckartenzlingen / DE | [2009/34] | Application number, filing date | 09001866.4 | 11.02.2009 | [2009/34] | Priority number, date | DE20081009551 | 16.02.2008 Original published format: DE102008009551 | [2009/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2090844 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2090844 | Date: | 05.08.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/18, F24H7/04, F28D20/00 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
F24H1/182 (EP);
F24H7/04 (EP);
F28D20/0039 (EP);
Y02E60/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/11] |
Former [2009/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Warmwasserspeicher | [2009/34] | English: | Hot water tank | [2009/34] | French: | Accumulateur d'eau chaude | [2009/34] | Examination procedure | 05.02.2016 | Examination requested [2016/11] | 06.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/31] | 15.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CH650585 (ISOPAG AG) [X] 1,2,5,7-9 * pages 3-5; figures 1-3 * [I] 14; | [XI]DE2911990 (BORSDORF HEINZ DIPL ING) [X] 1,3,5-7,10-12 * pages 7-12; figures 1, 5, 9, 12 * [I] 9; | [XI]DE9301518U (SIEGEMUND, ANDREAS [DE]) [X] 1,5,7 * page 1; figures 1, 2 * [I] 2,9; | [IY]DE4114076 (VOELSKOW PETER [DE]) [I] 1,7-9,15 * columns 2-4; figure 1 * [Y] 6,11,12,14,16; | [Y]DE2553288 (SCHOELL GUENTER) [Y] 6,11,12,14,16 * pages 5-12; figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE19510490 (CONSOLAR ENERGIESPEICHER UND R [DE]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * |