EP2219312 - Apparatus for providing a combined digital signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. Sanno Park Tower 36th floor, 11-1, Nagata-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. SANNO PARK TOWER, 36th Floor 11-1, Nagata-cho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhao, Jian Hirzenbachstrasse 4 8051 Zuerich / CH | 02 /
Kuhn, Marc Rosmarinweg 3 8057 Zuerich / CH | 03 /
Wittneben, Armin Loonstrasse 32 5443 Niederrohrdorf / CH | 04 /
Bauch, Gerhard Barer Strasse 58 80799 Munich / DE | [2010/33] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/33] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 09001925.8 | 11.02.2009 | [2010/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2219312 | Date: | 18.08.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/00 | [2010/33] | CPC: |
H04L1/0041 (EP,US);
H04L1/005 (EP,US);
H04L1/007 (EP,US);
H04L2001/0097 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/17] |
Former [2010/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung eines kombinierten digitalen Signals | [2010/33] | English: | Apparatus for providing a combined digital signal | [2010/33] | French: | Appareil pour fournir un signal numérique combiné | [2010/33] | Examination procedure | 04.02.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/33] | 16.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.03.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/06] | 04.01.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.01.2012 | 27.01.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006071187 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [X] 1-4,7-8,10-15 * abstract * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 27 * * page 8, line 10 - page 12, line 14 * * page 16, line 30 - page 19, line 18 * * figures 2,3,5a,5b,6a * [I] 5-6,9; | [X]WO2008109538 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 7,12,15 * abstract * * page 2, line 14 - page 3, line 9 * * page 4, line 21 - page 9, line 14 * * figures 3,4 *; | [A]WO2008108708 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 6, line 16 - page 7, line 4 * * page 10, line 5 - page 14, line 3 * * page 16, line 15 - page 19, line 26 * | by applicant | - "Multi-way communication channels", R. AHLSWEDE, Proc. 2nd IEEE Int. Symposium on Inf. Theory, ARMENIAN SSR: AKADEMIAI KIADO, (197109), pages 23 - 52 | - XIE L.-L. XIE, "Network coding and random binning for multi-user channels", PROC. OF THE 10TH CANADIAN WORKSHOP ON INFORMATION THEORY, (20070606), pages 85 - 88 | - OECHTERING T. J. OECHTERING ET AL., "Broadcast capacity region of two-phase bidirectional relaying", IEEE TRANS. INFORM. THEORY, (200801), vol. 54, no. 1, pages 454 - 458 | - L.-L. XIE, "Network coding and random binning for multi-user channels", PROC. OF THE 10TH CANADIAN WORKSHOP ON INFORMATION THEORY, (20070606), pages 85 - 88 | - T. J. OECHTERING ET AL., "Broadcast capacity region of two-phase bidirectional relaying", IEEE TRANS. INFORM. THEORY, (200801), vol. 54, no. 1, pages 454 - 458 | - B. RANKOV; A. WITTNEBEN, "Spectral efficient protocols for half-duplex fading relay channels", IEEE J. SELECT. AREAS COMMUN., (200702), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 379 - 389 | - R. F. WYREMBELSKI ET AL., "Capacity of Gaussian MIMO bidirectional broadcast channels", IEEE INT. SYMPOSIUM ON INF. THEORY, (200807), pages 584 - 588 | - G. UNGERBOECK, "Channel coding with multilevel/phase signals", IEEE TRANS. INFORM. THEORY, (198201), vol. 28, no. 1, pages 55 - 67 | - N. TRAN; H. NGUYEN, "Multi-dimensional mappings of M-ary constellations for BICM-ID systems", CANADIAN CONFERENCE ON ELECTRICAL AND COMPUTER ENGINEERING | - L. SZCZECINSKI; H. CHAFNAJI; C. HERMOSILLA, "Modulation doping for iterative demapping of bit-interleaved coded modulation", IEEE COMMUN. LETT., (2005), vol. 9, no. 12, pages 1031 - 1033 | - G. CAIRE; G. TARICCO; E. BIGLIERI, "Bit-interleaved coded modulation", IEEE TRANS. INFORM. THEORY, (199805), vol. 44, no. 3, pages 927 - 945 | - S. BARO, "Turbo detection for MIMO systems: bit labeling and pre-coding", EUROP. TRANS. TELECOMMUN., (2004), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 343 - 350 | - G. POTTIE; D. TAYLOR, "Multilevel codes based on partitioning", IEEE TRANS. INFORM. THEORY, (198901), vol. 35, no. 1, pages 87 - 98 | - S. PIETROBON; D. COSTELLO, "Trellis coding with multidimensional QAM signal sets", IEEE TRANS. INFORM. THEORY, (199303), vol. 39, no. 2, pages 325 - 336 | - R. JOHANNESSON; P. STAHL, "New rate 1/2, 1/3, and 1/4 binary convolutional encoders with an optimum distance profile", IEEE TRANS. INFORM. THEORY, (199907), vol. 45, no. 5, pages 1653 - 1658 | - A. CHINDAPOL; J. RITCEY, "Design, analysis, and performance evaluation for BICM-ID with square QAM constellations in rayleigh fading channels", IEEE J. SELECT. AREAS COMMUN., (200105), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 944 - 957 | - A. C. X. LI; J. A. RITCEY, "Bit-interleaved coded modulation with iterative decoding and 8 PSK signaling", IEEE TRANS. COMMUN., (200208), vol. 50, no. 8, pages 1250 - 1257 | - X. LI; J. RITCEY, "Trellis-coded modulation with bit interleaving and iterative decoding", IEEE J. SELECT. AREAS COMMUN., (199904), vol. 17, no. 4, pages 715 - 724 | - N. TRAN; H. NGUYEN, "Design and performance of BICM-ID systems with hypercube constellations", IEEE TRANS. WIREL. COMM., (200605), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 1169 - 1179 | - A. CHINDAPOL; J. RITCEY, "Design, analysis, and performance evaluation for BICM-ID with square QAM constellations in rayleigh fading channels", IEEE J.SELECT. AREAS COMMUN., (200105), vol. 19, no. 5, pages 944 - 957 | - 1. HAMMERSTR6M ET AL., "MIMO Two-Way-Relaying with Transmit CSI at the Relay", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING ADVANCES IN WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, (200706), page 5 |